EP1366046 - MONOMER FOR USE IN PREPARATION OF A POLYMER TO BE USED IN OPTICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cambridge Display Technology Limited Building 2020 Cambourne Business Park Cambridgeshire, CB3 6DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Cambridge Display Technology Limited Building 2020, Cambourne Business Park Cambridgeshire, CB3 6DW / GB | ||
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Cambridge Display Technology Limited Building 2020, Cambourne Business Park Cambridgeshire, CB3 6DW / GB | ||
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states Cambridge Display Technology Limited Greenwich House, Madingley Rise, Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0TX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURROUGHES, Jeremy Cambridge Display Tech.Ltd. Greenwich House Madingley Rise Madingley Rd. Cambridge CB3 OTX / GB | 02 /
TOWNS, Carl Cambridge Display Tech. Ltd. Greenwich House Madingley Rise Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 OTX / GB | 03 /
POUNDS, Thomas Cambridge Display Tech. Ltd. Greenwich House Madingley Rise Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 OTX / GB | 04 /
HALLS, Jonathan Cambridge Display Techn. Ltd. Greenwich House Madingley Rise Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 OTX / GB | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Gilani, Anwar Cambridge Display Technology Ltd., Building 2020, Cambourne Business Park Cambridgeshire CB3 6DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Gilani, Anwar Cambridge Display Technology Ltd., Building 2020, Cambourne Business Park Cambridgeshire CB3 6DW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02710106.2 | 23.01.2002 | [2003/49] | WO2002GB00294 | Priority number, date | GB20010001824 | 24.01.2001 Original published format: GB 0101824 | GB20010014538 | 14.06.2001 Original published format: GB 0114538 | US20010310588P | 07.08.2001 Original published format: US 310588 P | [2003/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02059121 | Date: | 01.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1366046 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1366046 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/14, C08G61/10, C09K11/06 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
H10K85/113 (EP,US);
C08G61/10 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
H10K85/151 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1007 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1051 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1092 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1408 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1416 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1425 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1458 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1483 (EP,US);
H10K30/30 (EP,US);
H10K30/50 (EP);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K85/115 (EP,US);
Y02E10/549 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/49] | C07D417/14, C08G61/10, C09K11/06, H01L51/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONOMER ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER HERSTELLUNG VON EINEM POLYMER UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG IN OPTISCHEN ELEMENTEN | [2003/49] | English: | MONOMER FOR USE IN PREPARATION OF A POLYMER TO BE USED IN OPTICAL DEVICES | [2003/49] | French: | MONOMERE DESTINE A LA PREPARATION D'UN POLYMERE INTERVENANT DANS DES APPAREILS OPTIQUES | [2003/49] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 26.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 30.09.2004 | [2005/13] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2006 | BE | 18.10.2006 | CH | 18.10.2006 | CY | 18.10.2006 | FI | 18.10.2006 | IT | 18.10.2006 | LI | 18.10.2006 | TR | 18.10.2006 | DK | 18.01.2007 | SE | 18.01.2007 | GR | 19.01.2007 | IE | 23.01.2007 | LU | 23.01.2007 | ES | 29.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
CY | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
IE | 23.01.2007 | ||
LU | 23.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
IE | 23.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
IE | 23.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | ES | 29.01.2007 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO0046321 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [AD]WO0055927 (CAMBRIDGE DISPLAY TECH LTD [GB], et al); | [PA]WO0149768 (CAMBRIDGE DISPLAY TECH LTD [GB], et al); | [PA]WO0162869 (CAMBRIDGE DISPLAY TECH LTD [GB], et al) |