EP1360025 - CUTTING HEAD FOR MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teeness Asa Nedre Ila 39 7419 Trondheim / NO | [2003/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLE, Trude Toftes gate 29 N-0556 Oslo / NO | 02 /
BJÖRVIK, Per Nordslettveien 257 N-7038 Trondheim / NO | 03 /
SOLLIE, Pal Kvitsteinvn. 68 N-7027 Trondheim / NO | 04 /
STOKLAND, Knut, S. Perslia 51 N-7088 Trondheim / NO | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02710573.3 | 15.01.2002 | [2003/46] | WO2002NO00020 | Priority number, date | NO20010000380 | 23.01.2001 Original published format: NO 20010380 | [2003/46] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02058869 | Date: | 01.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1360025 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1360025 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23B29/04, // B23B27:00 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
B23B27/007 (EP,US);
B23B29/046 (EP,US);
Y10T407/14 (EP,US);
Y10T407/227 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2585 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDKOPF FÜR WERKZEUGMASCHINE | [2003/46] | English: | CUTTING HEAD FOR MACHINE TOOL | [2003/46] | French: | TETE DE COUPE POUR MACHINE OUTIL | [2003/46] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2002 | Translation filed | 21.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 05.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 29.09.2004 | CH | 29.09.2004 | FI | 29.09.2004 | LI | 29.09.2004 | NL | 29.09.2004 | TR | 29.09.2004 | DK | 29.12.2004 | GR | 29.12.2004 | CY | 15.01.2005 | LU | 15.01.2005 | IE | 17.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | PT | 28.02.2005 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/20] | BE | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
CY | 15.01.2005 | ||
LU | 15.01.2005 | ||
IE | 17.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | BE | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
LU | 15.01.2005 | ||
IE | 17.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | BE | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 17.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | BE | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 17.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BE | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | BE | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | BE | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 29.09.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0342692 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP [JP]); | [A]US5330297 (ENGSTRAND SVEN [SE]); | [Y]WO9939852 (SANDVIK AB [SE], et al); | [Y]EP0947267 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]); | [A]US6076999 (HEDBERG ANNA [SE], et al); | [YP]SE514938 (SANDVIK AB [SE]); | [YP]WO0164377 (SANDVIK AB [SE], et al) |