EP1366333 - TWO ALIGNING DEVICES AND AN ALIGNMENT METHOD FOR A FIRING SIMULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAAB AB 581 88 Linköping / SE | [2003/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENNTOFT, Per Pilgatan 12 S-568 31 Skillingaryd / SE | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Holmberg, Magnus, et al Zacco Sweden AB Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Holmberg, Magnus, et al Albihns.Zacco Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2006/01] | Holmberg, Magnus, et al Albihns Stockholm AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 02710634.3 | 07.02.2002 | [2003/49] | WO2002SE00203 | Priority number, date | SE20010000497 | 15.02.2001 Original published format: SE 0100497 | [2003/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02065044 | Date: | 22.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1366333 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1366333 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F41A33/02 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
F41A33/02 (EP,US);
F41G3/2655 (EP);
F41G3/326 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/49] | Title | German: | ZWEI AUSRICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN UND EIN AUSRICHTUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN SCHIESSÜBUNGSSIMULATOR | [2003/49] | English: | TWO ALIGNING DEVICES AND AN ALIGNMENT METHOD FOR A FIRING SIMULATOR | [2003/49] | French: | DOUBLE DISPOSITIF D'ALIGNEMENT ET PROCEDE D'ALIGNEMENT POUR SIMULATEUR DE TIR | [2003/49] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 21.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 05.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.05.2012 | BE | 09.05.2012 | CY | 09.05.2012 | DK | 09.05.2012 | FI | 09.05.2012 | IT | 09.05.2012 | NL | 09.05.2012 | SE | 09.05.2012 | TR | 09.05.2012 | GR | 10.08.2012 | ES | 20.08.2012 | PT | 10.09.2012 | IE | 07.02.2013 | LU | 07.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
TR | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 07.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 07.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 09.05.2012 | |
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 09.05.2012 | |
SE | 09.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3792535 (MARSHALL A, et al); | [A]US5001836 (CAMERON JEFFREY A [US], et al); | [A]US5060391 (CAMERON JEFFREY A [US], et al); | [A]WO0053993 (SAAB TRAINING SYSTEMS AB [SE], et al) |