EP1363578 - ARRANGEMENT TO BE MOUNTED ON A ROLLATOR AND A ROLLATOR WITH SUCH AN ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sorensen, Ralf Henry Harbo Vesterlokken 9, Vrold 8660 Skanderborg / DK | [2003/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Johan Vroldvej 142 DK-8660 Skanderborg / DK | 02 /
SORENSEN, Ralf Henry Harbo Vesterlokken 9, Vrold 8660 Skanderborg / DK | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Tellefsen, Jens J., et al Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Tellefsen, Jens J., et al Patrade A/S, Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 02710768.9 | 07.02.2002 | [2003/48] | WO2002DK00087 | Priority number, date | DK20010000039 | 07.02.2001 Original published format: DK 200100039 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02062285 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1363578 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61H3/04 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
A61H3/04 (EP);
A61H2003/001 (EP);
A61H2003/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AN EINER GEHHILFE ZU BEFESTIGENDE ANORDNUNG UND GEHHILFE MIT EINER SOLCHEN ANORDNUNG | [2003/48] | English: | ARRANGEMENT TO BE MOUNTED ON A ROLLATOR AND A ROLLATOR WITH SUCH AN ARRANGEMENT | [2003/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF A MONTER SUR UN CADRE DE MARCHE DU TYPE ROLLATOR ET CADRE DE MARCHE DU TYPE ROLLATOR DOTE DUDIT DISPOSITIF | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 01.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/10] | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5964473 (DEGONDA ANDRE [CH], et al); | [X]EP0873741 (HANDI NETWORK INTERNATIONAL CO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0468106 (BERNING LOUIS G [US]) |