EP1265422 - PORTABLE RADIO TERMINAL AND SOUND DELIVERY METHOD AND SOUND INTAKE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAMURA, Haruhiko, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02711298.6 | 04.02.2002 | [2002/50] | WO2002JP00889 | Priority number, date | JP20010033841 | 09.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001033841 | [2002/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02065738 | Date: | 22.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1265422 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/00, H04M1/725 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
H04M1/6058 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04M1/7243 (EP,US);
H04M2250/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/50] | H04M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/50] | Title | German: | FUNKENDGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHALLWIEDERGABE VON SCHALLAUFNAHME | [2002/50] | English: | PORTABLE RADIO TERMINAL AND SOUND DELIVERY METHOD AND SOUND INTAKE METHOD | [2002/50] | French: | TERMINAL RADIO PORTATIF, PROCEDE DE DIFFUSION DE SON ET PROCEDE DE PRISE DE SON | [2002/50] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2002 | Translation filed | 17.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 31.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/20] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4972457 (O'SULLIVAN HARRY M [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract *; | [X]WO9734402 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-16 * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 19 *; | [X]WO9900962 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 6, line 8 - line 10 * * page 7, line 13 - line 27 * * page 9, line 11 - line 22 * * page 10, line 1 - line 3 *; | [X]WO9943136 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * page 7, line 6 - line 8 * * page 8, line L - page 9, line 13; figure 6.7 *; | [X]WO9960713 (SWISSCOM AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 11, line 1 - line 20 * * page 12, line 8 - line 16 * * page 17, line 13 - line 17 *; | [X]WO0045570 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-16 * abstract *; | [PX]WO0120880 (BARRON JACK [US]) [PX] 1-16 * page 3, line 23 - line 33 *; | [PX]EP1104150 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [PX] 1-16 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] *; | [PX]US2001006905 (HONG CHU-CHAI [TW]) [PX] 1-16* abstract *; | [PX]EP1154621 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [PX] 1-16 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH10336786 (YAESU MUSEN KK); | [A]EP0892534 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]); | [X]JPH11168534 (ONKYO KK); | [X]JP2000059494 (NEC SAITAMA LTD); | [A]JP2000299718 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |