EP1362600 - TOPICAL USE OF NF-kB DECOYS FOR TREATING ATOPIC DERMATITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/47] | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING DECOY AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME | ||
[2007/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AnGes MG, Inc. 7-7-15, Saito-Asagi, Ibaraki Osaka 567-0085 / JP | [2008/12] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Anges MG Inc. 4-2, Shinsenrihigashimachi 1-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0082 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORISHITA, Ryuichi, c/o AnGes MG, Inc. 7-7-15, Saito-Asagi Ibaraki, Osaka 567-0085 / JP | 02 /
AOKI, Motokuni, c/o AnGes MG, Inc. 7-7-15, Saito-Asagi Ibaraki, Osaka 567-0085 / JP | 03 /
OGIHARA, Toshio, c/o AnGes MG, Inc. 7-7-15, Saito-Asagi Ibaraki, Osaka 567-0085 / JP | 04 /
KANEDA, Yasufumi, c/o AnGes MG, Inc. 7-7-15, Saito-Asagi Ibaraki, Osaka 567-0085 / JP | 05 /
NAKAMURA, Hiroshige 22-16 Hinoikecho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662-0084 / JP | [2006/44] |
Former [2006/32] | 01 /
MORISHITA, Ryuichi, c/o AnGes MG, Inc. 4-2, Shinsenrihigashimachi 1-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0082 / JP | ||
02 /
AOKI, Motokuni, c/o AnGes MG, Inc. 4-2, Shinsenrihigashimachi 1-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0082 / JP | |||
03 /
OGIHARA, Toshio, c/o AnGes MG, Inc. 4-2, Shinsenrihigashimachi 1-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0082 / JP | |||
04 /
KANEDA, Yasufumi, c/o AnGes MG, Inc. 4-2, Shinsenrihigashimachi 1-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0082 / JP | |||
05 /
NAKAMURA, Hiroshige 22-16 Hinoikecho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662-0084 / JP | |||
Former [2003/47] | 01 /
MORISHITA, Ryuichi, c/o AnGes MG, Inc. 4-2, Shinsenrihigashimachi 1-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0082 / JP | ||
02 /
AOKI, Motokuni, c/o AnGes MG, Inc. 4-2, Shinsenrihigashimachi 1-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0082 / JP | |||
03 /
OGIHARA, Toshio, c/o AnGes MG, Inc. 4-2, Shinsenrihigashimachi 1-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0082 / JP | |||
04 /
KANEDA, Yasufumi, c/o AnGes MG, Inc. 4-2, Shinsenrihigashimachi 1-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0082 / JP | |||
05 /
NAKAMURA, Hiroshige, c/o AnGes MG, Inc. 4-2, Shinsenrihigashimachi 1-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0082 / JP | Representative(s) | Williams, Aylsa D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | Williams, Aylsa D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02711351.3 | 06.02.2002 | [2003/47] | WO2002JP00990 | Priority number, date | JP20010044350 | 20.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001044350 | [2003/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02066070 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1362600 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1362600 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, A61K31/711, A61K9/06, A61K47/06, A61K47/10, A61P17/00, A61P17/04 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
A61K31/711 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/14] |
Former [2003/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TOPISCHE ANWENDUNG EINES NF-kB DECOYS ZUR BEHANDLUNG ATOPISCHER DERMATITIS | [2007/41] | English: | TOPICAL USE OF NF-kB DECOYS FOR TREATING ATOPIC DERMATITIS | [2007/41] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN LEURRE NF-kB DE MANIERE TOPIQUE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DERMATITE ATOPIQUE | [2007/41] |
Former [2003/47] | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT EINEM DECOY UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2003/47] | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING DECOY AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME | ||
Former [2003/47] | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT UN LEURRE ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION ASSOCIE | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2003 | Translation filed | 29.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.08.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 02.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06004446.8 / EP1690544 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9511687 (DZAU VICTOR J [US]) [X] 1-6* page 9, lines 5-7 *; | [X]EP0824918 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-6 * claims 1,2 *; | [E]WO0229044 (HECKER MARKUS [DE], et al) [E] 1,2,4 * page 6, lines 14-25; figures 3,4; claim - * * page 17, lines 4-18 * | International search | [AE]JP2001055331 (TOYAMA CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X] - ABEYAMA, KAZUHIRO ET AL., "role for NF-kappaB-dependent gene transactivation in sunburn", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (2000), vol. 105, no. 12, pages 1751 - 1759, XP002951039 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI9745 | [A] - HIDI, RABIA ET AL., "Role of B7-CD28/CTLA-4 costimulation and NF-kappaB in allergen-induced T cell chemotaxis by IL-16 and RANTES", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 164, no. 1, pages 412 - 418, XP002951040 |