EP1364980 - POLYTRIMETHYLENE TEREPHTHALATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): FR, GB | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Fibers Limited 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [2010/43] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Fibers Corporation 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8205 / JP | ||
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8205 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Jinichiro Higashiasahi apartmemnt 333 34, Sakurazono-cho Nobeoka-shi, Miyazaki 882-0036 / JP | 02 /
AZUMA, Yoichiro 1-85-1, Hirabaru-cho Nobeoka-shi, Miyazaki 882-0866 / JP | 03 /
FUJIMOTO, Katsuhiro 1-20-6, Sakuragaoka Nobeoka-shi, Miyazaki 882-0007 / JP | 04 /
MATSUO, Teruhiko 1-18-5, Tsurugaoka Nobeoka-shi, Miyazaki 882-0865 / JP | [2013/35] |
Former [2003/48] | 01 /
KATO, Jinichiro Higashiasahi apartmemnt 333 34, Sakurazono-cho Nobeoka-shi, Miyazaki 882-0036 / JP | ||
02 /
AZUMA, Yoichiro 1-85-1, Hirabaru-cho Nobeoka-shi, Miyazaki 882-0866 / JP | |||
03 /
FUJIMOTO, Katsuhiro 1-20-6, Sakuragaoka Nobeoka-shi, Miyazaki 882-0007 / JP | |||
04 /
MATSUO, Teruhiko 1-18-5, Tsurugaoka Nobeoka-shi, Miyazaki 882-0865 / JP | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2003/48] | Weber, Thomas, Dr.Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02711386.9 | 07.02.2002 | [2003/48] | WO2002JP01047 | Priority number, date | JP20010031288 | 07.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001031288 | JP20010077474 | 19.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001077474 | [2003/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02062868 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1364980 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1364980 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1364980 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/183, C08J5/00, D01F6/62 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
C08G63/183 (EP,KR);
C08G63/672 (EP);
C08G63/80 (EP);
C08J5/00 (KR);
D01F6/62 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Title | German: | POLYTRIMETHYLENTEREPHTHALAT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2003/48] | English: | POLYTRIMETHYLENE TEREPHTHALATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2003/48] | French: | POLYTRIMETHYLENE TEREPHTALATE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2003 | Translation filed | 15.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 10.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.08.2008
27.12.2011
WITHDRAWN Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL Opponent's representative Browne, Julie, et al, et al Shell International Limited Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 662 London SE1 7NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.08.2008
27.12.2011
WITHDRAWN Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL Opponent's representative Browne, Julie, et al, et al Shell International Limited, Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 662 London SE1 7NE / GB | ||
Former [2008/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.08.2008
WITHDRAWN Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL Opponent's representative Browne, Julie, et al, et al Shell International Limited, Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 662 London SE1 7NE / GB | 11.09.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.03.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 27.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.12.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.12.2012 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 16.07.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2007 | BE | 07.11.2007 | CH | 07.11.2007 | CY | 07.11.2007 | DK | 07.11.2007 | FI | 07.11.2007 | LI | 07.11.2007 | IE | 07.02.2008 | LU | 07.02.2008 | SE | 07.02.2008 | GR | 08.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | NL | 01.09.2008 | IT | 07.02.2009 | GB | 07.02.2011 | FR | 28.02.2011 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/14] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2008 | ||
LU | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
NL | 01.09.2008 | ||
IT | 07.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2008 | ||
LU | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
NL | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
NL | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
NL | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
NL | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
NL | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10259244 ; | [X]US5798433 (SCHMIDT WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * example -; table - *; | [X]EP1016692 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [E]EP1245604 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [E] 1-14 * example - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10259244 A 19980929 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 6-11 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2000159875 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) |