EP1367855 - VIBRATION DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kenwood 2967-3, Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8525 / JP | [2007/40] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kenwood 2967-3, Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8525 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAZAWA, Hiroshi 20-7, Enoki-cyo Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-1104 / JP | 02 /
OKA, Yoshikazu 993-5-403, Nakayama-cyo Midori-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 226-00 / JP | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/49] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7, II Aufgang 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02711415.6 | 08.02.2002 | [2003/49] | WO2002JP01087 | Priority number, date | JP20010034573 | 09.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001034573 | [2003/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02065812 | Date: | 22.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1367855 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1367855 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04R23/00, G01H9/00 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
G01H9/004 (EP,US);
G01H9/00 (EP,US);
H04R23/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/20] |
Former [2003/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWINGUNGSSENSOR | [2007/13] | English: | VIBRATION DETECTOR | [2003/49] | French: | DETECTEUR DE VIBRATIONS | [2003/49] |
Former [2003/49] | VIBRATIONSDETEKTOR | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2003 | Translation filed | 28.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 15.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS5857898 ; | [A]US4162397 (BUCARO JOSEPH A [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * abstract *; | [A]US4166932 (SELWAY PETER R [GB]) [A] 1,7 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 5; figures 1,2 *; | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830623), vol. 007, no. 144, Database accession no. (E - 183), & JP58057898 A 19830406 (MATSUSHITA DENKO KK) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,10 * abstract * [A] 5,12,13 | [XA] - HAH D ET AL, "An optomechanical pressure sensor using multimode interference couplers with polymer waveguides on a thin p<+>-Si membrane", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (200002), vol. 79, no. 3, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 204 - 210, XP004190469 [X] 1-4,6,7,9-11 * Sections 2 and 3.1;; figures 1-3 * [A] 5,12,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-4247(99)00284-8 | [A] - "ANNOUNCEMENT", MACHINE DESIGN, PENTON/IPC, CLEVELAND, US, (19941212), vol. 66, no. 23, ISSN 0024-9114, page 71, XP000492548 [A] 1,7 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPS61170623 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JPH02107927 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [Y]US4268116 (SCHMADEL DONALD, et al) |