EP1358672 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING A CARRIER PART FROM A CARRIER, AND A PRODUCTREMOVED FROM A CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Besi Netherlands B.V. Ratio 6 6921 RW Duiven / NL | [2014/25] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states FICO B.V. Ratio 6 6921 RW Duiven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DALEN, Adrianus, Wilhelmus Zwanenveld 25-09 NL-6538 NG Nijmegen / NL | 02 /
VAN EGMOND, Henri, Joseph Wilsondreef 1 NL-6716 DN Ede / NL | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus Patentwerk BV P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | Application number, filing date | 02711527.8 | 29.01.2002 | [2003/45] | WO2002NL00068 | Priority number, date | NL20011017215 | 29.01.2001 Original published format: NL 1017215 | NL20011018511 | 11.07.2001 Original published format: NL 1018511 | [2003/45] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02061822 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1358672 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/48 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
H01L21/4842 (EP,US);
H01L21/52 (KR);
H01L21/561 (EP,US);
H01L21/568 (EP,US);
H01L23/3121 (EP,US);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
Y10T29/515 (EP,US);
Y10T83/0207 (EP,US);
Y10T83/04 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9447 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM HERAUSTRENNEN DES TRÄGERTEILS AUS EINEM LEITERRAHMEN UND EIN AUS EINEM LEITERRAHMEN HERAUSGETRENNTES PRODUKT | [2003/45] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING A CARRIER PART FROM A CARRIER, AND A PRODUCTREMOVED FROM A CARRIER | [2003/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF SERVANT A ENLEVER UNE PARTIE DE SUPPORT D'UN SUPPORT ET PRODUIT ENLEVE DU SUPPORT | [2003/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2002 | Translation filed | 29.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 07.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.03.2017 | 17.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/24] | 27.01.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/24] | 27.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH09223706 ; | [XY]JPH08204091 ; | [X]JPH065758 ; | [X]JPH09307046 ; | [XA]JPH0722554 ; | [X]DE2526318 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]JPS5890750 ; | [A]JP2000216318 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09223706 A 19970826 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-4,11-15 * the whole document * [Y] 5-9 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP08204091 A 19960809 (NEC CORP) [X] 10,16-18 * the whole document * [Y] 5-9 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940407), vol. 018, no. 199, Database accession no. (E - 1534), & JP06005758 A 19940114 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-4,11-15 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP09307046 A 19971128 (NEC CORP) [X] 1-4,11-15 * the whole document * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 1995, no. 04, & JP07022554 A 19950124 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 11 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830816), vol. 007, no. 186, Database accession no. (E - 193), & JP58090750 A 19830530 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1,2,4,11-15 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000216318 A 20000804 (HIROSHIMA NIPPON DENKI KK) [A] 5,10,16 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH09223706 | JPS5890750 |