EP1352099 - METHOD FOR AVOIDING DRAG-IN OF ZINC PARTICLES ON GALVANIZED SHEET METAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARCELOR France 1 à 5, rue Luigi Cherubini 93200 Saint Denis / FR | [2006/34] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states USINOR Immeuble "La Pacific", La Défense 7, 11/13 Cours Valmy 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Recherche et Développement GROUPE COCKERILL SAMBRE Boulevard de Colonster B57 4000 Liège / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBOIS, Michel Rue Damry 51 B-4100 Boncelles / BE | 02 /
TOMBU, Michel Grand Route 156 B-4400 Flémalle Grande / BE | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Pronovem Office Van Malderen Parc d'affaires Zénobe Gramme- bâtiment K Square des Conduites d'Eau 1-2 4020 Liège / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | pronovem Office Van Malderen Bld. de la Sauvenière 85/043 4000 Liège / BE | ||
Former [2006/33] | Van Malderen, Michel, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Bd. de la Sauvenière 85/043 4000 Liège / BE | ||
Former [2003/42] | Van Malderen, Michel, et al Office van Malderen 85/043 Boulevard de la Sauvenière 4000 Liège / BE | Application number, filing date | 02711660.7 | 16.01.2002 | [2003/42] | WO2002BE00006 | Priority number, date | EP20010870010 | 17.01.2001 Original published format: EP 01870010 | [2003/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02057505 | Date: | 25.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1352099 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352099 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/00 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
C23C2/00 (EP,US);
C23C2/00348 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERMEIDUNG VON ZINKTEILCHENBELADUNG AUF EINEM GALVANISIERTEN BLECH | [2003/42] | English: | METHOD FOR AVOIDING DRAG-IN OF ZINC PARTICLES ON GALVANIZED SHEET METAL | [2003/42] | French: | PROCEDE POUR EVITER L'ENTRAINEMENT DE PARTICULES DE ZINC SUR UNE TOLE GALVANISEE | [2003/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 23.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.11.2007 | DK | 14.11.2007 | IE | 14.11.2007 | LU | 16.01.2008 | CH | 31.01.2008 | LI | 31.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | GR | 15.02.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | [2010/32] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | DK | 14.11.2007 | |
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 14.11.2007 | |
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | DK | 14.11.2007 | |
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | DK | 14.11.2007 | |
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | DK | 14.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07258818 ; | [A]JPH07145464 ; | [A]JPH01294851 ; | [AD]JPS6386852 ; | [A]JPH0762512 ; | [A]JPH0499852 ; | [A]JPH0874022 ; | [A]JPH07252619 ; | [A]JPH07145463 ; | [AD]EP0060225 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [CH]) [AD] 1 * page 8, line 12 - page 9, line 10; figure 2 *; | [A]WO9638599 (M3D SOCIETE ANONYME [FR], et al) [A] 1,5 * page 4, line 21 - line 28; figures 1-5; claim 10 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07258818 A 19951009 (FUJIKOO:KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07145464 A 19950606 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900214), vol. 014, no. 077, Database accession no. (C - 0688), & JP01294851 A 19891128 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 10 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880826), vol. 012, no. 316, Database accession no. (C - 524), & JP63086852 A 19880418 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [AD] 10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 1995, no. 06, & JP07062512 A 19950307 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [A] 10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920722), vol. 016, no. 338, Database accession no. (C - 0965), & JP04099852 A 19920331 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [A] 10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, & JP08074022 A 19960319 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [A] 10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07252619 A 19951003 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [A] 10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07145463 A 19950606 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 10 * abstract * |