EP1370592 - CATALYST FOR OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nova Chemicals (International) S.A. 2, chemin des Mazots 1700 Fribourg / CH | [2003/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Xiaoliang 6 Varmoor Place N.W. Calgary, Alberta T3A0A1 / CA | 02 /
CHISHOLM, P., Scott 4927 Batchelor Crescent N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2L 1S8 / CA | 03 /
KOWALCHUK, Matthew, Gerald 215, 216 Doverglen Crescent S.E. Calgary, Alberta T2B 2P6 / CA | 04 /
DONALDSON, Robert, D. 28 Fairways Drive NW Airdrie, Alberta T4B 2P5 / CA | [2004/09] |
Former [2003/51] | 01 /
GAO, Xiaoliang 6 Varmoor Place N.W. Calgary, Alberta T3A0A1 / CA | ||
02 /
CHISHOLM, P., Scott 4927 Batchelor Crescent N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2L 1S8 / CA | |||
03 /
KOWALCHUK, Matthew, Gerald 215, 216 Doverglen Crescent S.E. Calgary, Alberta T2B 2P6 / CA | |||
04 /
DONALDSON, Robert, D. 1003 Mayland Drive N.E. Calgary, Alberta T2E 6C3 / CA | Representative(s) | Watson, Robert James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Watson, Robert James, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02711710.0 | 11.02.2002 | [2003/51] | WO2002CA00157 | Priority number, date | CA20012338094 | 23.02.2001 Original published format: CA 2338094 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02066524 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1370592 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1370592 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/64 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
C08F10/02 (EP,US);
C08F4/642 (KR);
C08F110/02 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
C08F4/65925 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/02, C08F4/65916 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATALYSATOR FüR DIE OLEFINPOLYMERISATION | [2003/51] | English: | CATALYST FOR OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION | [2003/51] | French: | CATALYSEUR DE POLYMERISATION DES OLEFINES | [2003/51] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 02.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.12.2005 | CH | 14.12.2005 | CY | 14.12.2005 | FI | 14.12.2005 | LI | 14.12.2005 | TR | 14.12.2005 | IE | 13.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | DK | 14.03.2006 | GR | 14.03.2006 | SE | 14.03.2006 | PT | 15.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
TR | 14.12.2005 | ||
IE | 13.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IE | 13.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IE | 13.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IE | 13.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 14.12.2005 | |
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 14.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0754698 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * page 20, line 24 - page 20, line 32; examples 24-27 * * page 7, line 7 * [A] 6; | [X]US5780562 (SHIMIZU HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,9* column 26, line 28 - column 28, line 55; claim 1 *; | [X]US5834557 (TSUTSUI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * column 18, line 38 - column 18, line 54; examples PREPARATION,1 * | Examination | - ULLMANN'S ENCYCLOPEDIA OF INDUSTRIAL CHEMISTRY, VOLUME A23, PAGES 629-635 |