EP1371068 - WIRE AND CABLE INSULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics UK Limited Faraday Road, Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | [2003/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODWAY, Giles Henry The Old School, 20B The Green Calne, Wiltshire SN1 5HJ / GB | 02 /
STEADMAN, Stuart Charles 10 Friesian Close, Shaw Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 5RA / GB | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Jay, Anthony William, et al Tyco Electronics UK Limited European Patent Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Jay, Anthony William, et al Tyco Electronics UK Limited European Patent Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02712111.0 | 22.02.2002 | [2003/51] | WO2002GB00781 | Priority number, date | GB20010006739 | 14.03.2001 Original published format: GB 0106739 | GB20010014611 | 15.06.2001 Original published format: GB 0114611 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02073631 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1371068 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01B3/00, H01B3/44, C08L23/10, C08L23/12, C08L23/14, C08L23/16, C08K5/00, C01G9/00 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
H01B3/44 (EP,US);
H01B3/30 (KR);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/30 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
H01B3/00 (EP,US);
C08K2003/2296 (EP,US);
C08K2003/3036 (EP,US);
C08L2203/202 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08K3/30, C08L23/10 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 15.08.2003 | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHT UND KABEL ISOLATIONEN | [2003/51] | English: | WIRE AND CABLE INSULATION | [2003/51] | French: | ISOLATION DE FILS ET DE CABLES | [2003/51] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 01.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/19] | 22.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1059550 (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1,2,4,13-15 * page 4, lines 79-114; claim 1 *; | [X]US4069190 (VOSTOVICH JOSEPH EDWARD) [X] 1-6,8-10,13-15* column 2, lines 10-54; claims 1-7 *; | [X]US4125509 (VOSTOVICH JOSEPH E) [X] 1-6,8-10,13-15 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 64; claims 1-7 *; | [X]US4204024 (PYE RICHARD T [US]) [X] 1-4,6,14,15 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 41; claims 1-6 *; | [X]US4303574 (VOSTOVICH JOSEPH E) [X] 1-6,8-10,13-15 * column 5, line L; claims 1-4; tables 1,2 * |