EP1368283 - COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND SHAPED ARTICLE WITH THERMAL CONDUCTIVITY AND SPECIFIC GRAVITY ON DEMAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Schweiz AG Tüffenwies 16-22 8064 Zürich / CH | [2003/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜRGE, Theodor, A. Waldrütistrasse 3 CH-8954 Geroldswil / CH | 02 /
SCHIEGG, André Hölibachstrasse 114 CH-8912 Obfelden / CH | 03 /
GRISONI, Luca Via Don Francesco Crivelli 2 I-22070 Capiago Intimiano / IT | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/oSika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2003/50] | Isler, Jörg, et al c/o Sika Technology AG, Corp. Intellectual Property Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach CH-8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 02712144.1 | 15.02.2002 | [2003/50] | WO2002IB00464 | Priority number, date | EP20010104488 | 01.03.2001 Original published format: EP 01104488 | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02070429 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1368283 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1368283 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/02, C04B24/26 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C04B28/02 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00103 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B20/0048, C04B20/008, C04B24/26, C04B24/28, C04B2103/10, C04B2103/22, C04B2103/32 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B20/008, C04B20/0048, C04B24/26, C04B24/28, C04B40/0658, C04B2103/32 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2003/50] | C04B28/02, // (C04B28/02, 14:06, 14:08, 18:06, 24:22), C04B24:26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDMATERIAL UND FORMKÖRPER MIT EINSTELLBARER THERMISCHER LEITFÄHIGKEIT UND SPEZIFISCHER DICHTE | [2003/50] | English: | COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND SHAPED ARTICLE WITH THERMAL CONDUCTIVITY AND SPECIFIC GRAVITY ON DEMAND | [2003/50] | French: | MATERIAU COMPOSITE ET ARTICLE FORME A CONDUCTIVITE THERMIQUE ET A GRAVITE SPECIFIQUE A LA DEMANDE | [2003/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 16.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2006 | BE | 22.11.2006 | CH | 22.11.2006 | CY | 22.11.2006 | FI | 22.11.2006 | FR | 22.11.2006 | IT | 22.11.2006 | LI | 22.11.2006 | NL | 22.11.2006 | TR | 22.11.2006 | IE | 15.02.2007 | LU | 15.02.2007 | DK | 22.02.2007 | SE | 22.02.2007 | DE | 23.02.2007 | GR | 23.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | ES | 05.03.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CY | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
FR | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 15.02.2007 | ||
LU | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
DE | 23.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
FR | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
DE | 23.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
DE | 23.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
FR | 13.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
DE | 23.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
DE | 23.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
DE | 23.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
SE | 22.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPS61227958 ; | [A]SU1694394 ; | JPS59146960 [ ] (HOECHST GOSEI KK); | [A]EP0314242 (PUMPTECH NV [BE]) [A] 1-29* page 2, line 12 - line 35 *; | [Y]US4999056 (RASMUSSEN THORKILD H [DK]) [Y] 22,23 * column 4, line 29 - line 39 * * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 28 * * column 5, line 16 - line 19 * * claims 28,47 *; | [X]FR2704853 (DIJON BETON [FR]) [X] 1,3-12,21,22,24-28 * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 34 * * page 3, line 35 - page 45, line 2 *; | [XY]EP0744387 (MARUTAKA CONCRETE INDUSTRY CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-15,24-29 * page 2, line 5 - line 7 * * page 2, line 36 - line 54 * * page 3, line 18 - line 40 * * page 5, line 16 - line 22 * * page 6; table 3 * [Y] 20-23,29; | [X]WO9812149 (EKA CHEMICALS AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,11,12,25 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 34 * * claims 1,5,10,17 *; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 47, Database accession no. 1986-308799, XP002178575 & JPS61227958 A 19861011 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1,4,7,11,25,26 * abstract * [Y] 29 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 43, Database accession no. 1992-355843, XP002178576 & SU1694394 A 19911130 (CONCRETE FERROCONCRETE INST) [A] 1-29 * abstract * | [Y] - "Self-leveling flooring composition", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19850128), vol. 102, no. 4, Database accession no. 30985s, page 400, XP000184277 [Y] 20,21 * abstract * |