EP1402509 - DISPLAY DEVICE AND METHOD OF DISPLAYING AN IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLOMPENHOUWER, Michiel, A. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
LUNN, Geoffrey Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Deguelle, Wilhelmus H. G. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Deguelle, Wilhelmus H. G. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/14] | Deguelle, Wilhelmus H. G. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02712152.4 | 18.02.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002IB00485 | Priority number, date | EP20010201166 | 27.03.2001 Original published format: EP 01201166 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02077956 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1402509 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32, G09G3/20 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
G09G3/20 (KR);
G09G3/2003 (EP,US);
G09G3/32 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0452 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0407 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0457 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/14] | Title | German: | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR TEILFELDKODIERUNG | [2004/14] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE AND METHOD OF DISPLAYING AN IMAGE | [2004/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCEDE POUR AFFICHER UNE IMAGE | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 21.05.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1077445 (ADOBE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 3-8; claim 1 *; | [A]WO0067247 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,5 * abstract * * page 19, line 10 - page 20, line 6 * * page 29, line 1 - page 31, line 25 *; | [A]EP0875882 (GENESIS MICROCHIP INC [CA]) [A] 1-5 * column 10, line 46 - column 10, line 54; figures 1,2,5; claim 1 *; | [AP]EP1174855 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [AP] 1-5 * paragraphs [0021] - [0069] * |