EP1370128 - A COMBINED BALER/BALE WRAPPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Welmount Limited Kilmaine, County Mayo / IE | [2013/07] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Welmount Limited Kilmaine, County Mayo / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCHALE, Padraic Christopher Tumneenane Clonbur, County Mayo / IE | 02 /
MCHALE, Martin, William - Kilmaine, County Mayo / IE | 03 /
HEANEY, James John Killeenrevagh Hollymount, County Mayo / IE | 04 /
SHERIDAN, Gerard Patrick Tullyduff Kilmaine, County Mayo / IE | 05 /
O'CONNOR, Patrick Thomas Tuam Road Kilmaine, County Mayo / IE | 06 /
BIGGINS, John Patrick Cornfield Hollymount, County Mayo / IE | [2013/07] |
Former [2003/51] | 01 /
MCHALE, Padraic Christopher Tumneenane Clonbur, County Mayo / IE | ||
02 /
MCHALE, Martin, William Kilmaine County Mayo / IE | |||
03 /
HEANEY, James John Killeenrevagh Hollymount, County Mayo / IE | |||
04 /
SHERIDAN, Gerard Patrick Tullyduff Kilmaine, County Mayo / IE | |||
05 /
O'CONNOR, Patrick Thomas Tuam Road Kilmaine, County Mayo / IE | |||
06 /
BIGGINS, John Patrick Cornfield Hollymount, County Mayo / IE | Representative(s) | Gorman, Francis Fergus F. F. Gorman & Co. 15 Clanwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Gorman, Francis Fergus F. F. Gorman & Co. 15 Clanwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2003/51] | Gorman, Francis Fergus F. F. Gorman & Co. 15 Clanwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 02713164.8 | 22.03.2002 | [2003/51] | WO2002IE00037 | Priority number, date | IE20010000286 | 22.03.2001 Original published format: IE 20010286 | IE20010000678 | 19.07.2001 Original published format: IE 20010678 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02076183 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1370128 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1370128 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/07, A01F15/08 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
A01F15/071 (EP,US);
A01F15/07 (US);
A01F15/0883 (EP,US);
B65B11/04 (US);
B65B45/00 (US);
A01D39/005 (US);
A01D59/00 (US);
A01F15/0715 (US);
A01F2015/0735 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/51] | A01F15/07 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/51] | Extension states | AL | 03.10.2003 | LT | 03.10.2003 | LV | 03.10.2003 | MK | 03.10.2003 | RO | 03.10.2003 | SI | 03.10.2003 | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTE BALLENPRESSE UND BALLENUMHÜLLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2003/51] | English: | A COMBINED BALER/BALE WRAPPER | [2003/51] | French: | PRESSE À BALLES/ENRUBANNEUSE COMBINÉE | [2013/07] |
Former [2003/51] | PRESSE A BALLES/ENRUBANNEUSE COMBINEE | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 13.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10012350.4 / EP2292084 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.02.2014 | MC | 26.02.2014 | GR | 27.05.2014 | PT | 26.06.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2014/52] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
PT | 26.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2837780 (BOLLMANN SEN) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2152873 (LELY NV C VAN DER) [A] 234 * page 1, line 71 - page 7, line 117 ** figures 1,3-5 *; | [X]US4685270 (BRAMBILLA DARIO [IT]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 6 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0309938 (HESSTON SA [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 31 *; | [DXAY]US5822967 (HOOD WILLIAM A [US], et al) [DX] 116,240,288 * column 3, line 4 - column 8, line 50 * * figures 1,2,4-6,8C-9 * [A] 239 [Y] 237,238; | [DX]WO9904613 (COMTOR LIMITED [IE], et al) [DX] 116,240,288 * page 13, line 27 - page 14, line 22 * * page 15, line 21 - page 16, line 14 * * figures 8,11,12,15,16 *; | [A]EP0937384 (WELGER GEB [DE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 9 - column 7, line 13 * * figures 4,5,7 *; | [XA]DE29911916U (KOHNLE EUGEN [DE]) [X] 1 * page 11, line 14 - page 13, line 9 * * figures 1-2B * [A] 236; | [DX]EP0983720 (GRUNDERCO AG [CH]) [DX] 240 * column 2, line 33 - line 49 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 7 * * figures 1,4 *; | [XY]WO0059290 (ORKEL AS [NO], et al) [X] 234,235 * page 2, line 15 - line 16 * * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 16 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 237,238; | [X]EP1048201 (DEERE & CO [US]) [X] 116,240,288 * column 3, line 25 - column 6, line 58 * * figure 2 * | by applicant | IE990822 | DE3805224 | WO9608957 | WO9718699 | WO9904613 | EP0983720 | FR2783131 | WO0015023 | WO0036903 | EP1048201 |