EP1370382 - PROFILE TURNING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jakob Lach GmbH & Co. KG Donaustrasse 17 - 21 63452 Hanau / DE | [2008/17] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Jakob Lach GmbH & Co. KG Donaustrasse 17 - 21 63452 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAURER, Eugen Adam-Geck-Strasse 10 61239 Ober-Mörlen / DE | 02 /
LACH, Horst Dammstrasse 5 6450 Hanau 1 / DE | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Jochem, Bernd, et al Heinrich - Erb - Partner Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Hanauer Landstrasse 126-128 60314 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Jochem, Bernd, Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Beyer & Jochem Postfach 18 02 04 60083 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 02714185.2 | 12.03.2002 | [2003/51] | WO2002EP02670 | Priority number, date | DE2001113633 | 21.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10113633 | [2003/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02076660 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1370382 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1370382 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/16, B23B27/06, B23B27/04 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
B23B27/1629 (EP,US);
B23B27/06 (EP,US);
B23B2200/0461 (EP,US);
B23B2200/161 (EP,US);
B23B2222/28 (EP,US);
B23B2226/125 (EP,US);
B23B2226/315 (EP,US);
Y10T407/11 (EP,US);
Y10T407/116 (EP,US);
Y10T407/2268 (EP,US);
Y10T407/227 (EP,US);
Y10T407/228 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/51] | Title | German: | PROFIL-DREHWERKZEUG | [2003/51] | English: | PROFILE TURNING TOOL | [2003/51] | French: | TOUR A PROFILE | [2003/51] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.04.2008 | DK | 23.04.2008 | FI | 23.04.2008 | IE | 23.04.2008 | TR | 23.04.2008 | SE | 23.07.2008 | GR | 24.07.2008 | PT | 23.09.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | DK | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
GR | 24.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 23.04.2008 | |
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 23.04.2008 | |
PT | 23.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3268977 (DIEMOND LEROY H) [A] 1 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 1 * * column 2, line 70 - column 3, line 4 ** figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3705447 (KOLLAR JOHN P) [A] 1 * column 2, line 1 - line 20 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 9 * * figure - *; | [A]US4001925 (ERIKSSON STIG-LENNART) [A] 1 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 25 * * figure - *; | [A]EP0150901 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1 * page 11, line 4 - line 26 * * page 13, line 16 - line 20 * * figure 10 *; | [A]FR2626204 (CARBEX SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 9 - page 8, line 25 * * figures 1-5,8,15 *; | [DA]DE19937738 (JAKOB LACH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 34 * * figure - * | by applicant | US4601355 | DE3737304 |