EP1435911 - DEVICES INCLUDING PROTEIN MATRIX MATERIALS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gel-Del Technologies, Inc. 1479 Gortner Avenue St. Paul, MN 55108 / US | [2004/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASTERS, David 636 W. Third Street Hastings, MN 55033 / US | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Arends, William Gerrit, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Arends, William Gerrit, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02714808.9 | 01.02.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002US02848 | Priority number, date | US20010922418 | 03.08.2001 Original published format: US 922418 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03015754 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1435911 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61L27/34, A61L27/54 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61K9/0009 (EP,US);
A61K9/0085 (EP,US);
A61L27/34 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61K9/2063 (EP,US);
A61K9/2077 (EP,US);
A61K9/2095 (EP,US);
A61L2300/252 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/34, C08L89/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/29] | A61K9/127, A61K9/50, B01J13/02, B32B9/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRODUKTE MIT PROTEIN-MATRIX-MATERIALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2004/29] | English: | DEVICES INCLUDING PROTEIN MATRIX MATERIALS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME | [2004/29] | French: | DISPOSITIFS A BASE DE MATRICES PROTEIQUES ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION ASSOCIES | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 15.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/40] | 03.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/40] | Divisional application(s) | EP11002490.8 / EP2371352 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3800792 (MC KNIGHT J, et al) [X] 1,8-9,11-13,15-20 * column 3, line 22 - column 5, line 63 * * column 5 - column 6; example 1 * [I] 10,21; | [XI]FR2247258 (BIOLOG CONCEPTS INC [US]) [X] 1,8-9,11-13,15,18 * page 3, line 2 - page 4, line 3 * * page 8, lines 33-36 * * page 12 - page 13; examples 1,2 * * page 16 - page 18; examples 10,14,17 * [I] 10,14,16-17,19; | [XI]EP0099758 (UNIV STRATHCLYDE [GB]) [X] 1,8-9,11-13,15,20 * page 1, line 2 - page 2, line 20 * * page 3, lines 14-26 * * page 6, lines 4-23 * * claims 1-18 * [I] 10,14,16-17,21; | [A]US5004602 (HUTCHINSON FRANCIS G [GB]) [A] 1-2,5,8-21 * column 15; example 17 * * column 16; example 19 ** column 19; example 33 *; | [XI]EP0485210 (MATRIX PHARMA [US]) [X] 1,8-9,11-13,15 * page 2, lines 32,33,41,42 * * page 3, lines 20-23 * * page 3, line 47 - page 4, line 45 * * claims 1-10 * [I] 10,14,16-17; | [X]US5260004 (SAMUELSON LYNNE A [US], et al) [X] 1,8,11-13,15-18 * column 1, lines 12-38 * * column 2, lines 11-28 * * column 3, lines 15-32 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 26 * * claims 1,14-16 *; | [XI]WO9422423 (BUKH MEDITEC [DK], et al) [X] 1,8,11,13,15 * page 26; example 1 * [I] 9-10,12,14,16-17; | [XI]US5418222 (SONG SUK-ZU [US], et al) [X] 1-2,5,8-9,11-13,15 * column 3, lines 35-44 * * column 5, lines 50-64 * * column 6, lines 19-36 * * column 6 - column 8; examples 1-3 * [I] 10,14,16-17; | [XI]WO9741899 (INNOGENETICS NV [BE], et al) [X] 1-2,5,8,11-13,15-16,18 * page 28 - page 29; example 6 * [I] 9-10,14,17; | [XI]US6004943 (SHI RUI-WEN [CN], et al) [X] 1,8-9,11-13,15-16,18-21 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 4 * * column 4; examples 1-23 * * columns 5,6; table 1 * * claims 1-13 * [I] 10,14,17; | [XPL]WO0187267 (GEL DEL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-2,5,8-21 * page 5, lines 1-12 * * page 46, lines 17-24 * * page 49, line 7 - page 52, line 18 * * page 77 - page 81; examples 4-8 * * page 99; example 26 * [L] | International search | [A]US6287765 (CUBICCIOTTI ROGER S [US]) |