EP1390469 - CELL FUSION ASSAYS FOR THE IDENTIFICATION OF ANTIVIRAL COMPOUNDS, AND SYSTEMS AND KITS FOR PRACTICING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The J. David Gladstone Institutes 1650 Owens Street San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | [2005/22] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states The J. David Gladstone Institutes P.O. Box 419100 San Francisco, CA 94141 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDSMITH, Mark, A. c/o Genencor International, Inc. 925 Page Mill Rd Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US | 02 /
YOU, Yun 79 Westport Court Williamsville, NY 14221 / US | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02714843.6 | 04.02.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002US03464 | Priority number, date | US20010779324 | 07.02.2001 Original published format: US 779324 | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02062960 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1390469 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/569, G01N33/50, C12N15/62 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
G01N33/502 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6897 (EP,US);
G01N33/5008 (EP,US);
G01N33/56983 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/09] | C12N1/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLFUSIONSASSAYS ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG ANTIVIRALER VERBINDUNGEN SOWIE SYSTEME UND KITS ZU DEREN PRAKTISCHER AUSFÜHRUNG | [2004/09] | English: | CELL FUSION ASSAYS FOR THE IDENTIFICATION OF ANTIVIRAL COMPOUNDS, AND SYSTEMS AND KITS FOR PRACTICING THE SAME | [2004/09] | French: | DOSAGES DE FUSION CELLULAIRE DESTINES A L'IDENTIFICATION DE COMPOSES ANTIVIRAUX, ET LEURS SYSTEMES ET KITS D'APPLICATION | [2004/09] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 10.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/16] | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PY]WO0160995 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PY] 1-20* the whole document *; | [XY] - MOIR, S. AND POULIN, L., "Expression of HIV env Gene in a human T cell line for a rapid and quantifiable cell fusion assay", AIDS RESEARCH AND HUMAN RETROVIRUSES, (1996), vol. 12, no. 9, pages 811 - 820, XP009024126 [X] 1-4,6-11,19,20 * the whole document * [Y] 1-20 | [Y] - LITWIN V ET AL, "Human immunodeficiency virus type 1 membrane fusion mediated by a laboratory-adapted strain and a primary isolate analyzed by resonance energy transfer", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (199609), vol. 70, no. 9, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 6437 - 6441, XP002244212 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * | [A] - MCMANUS C M ET AL, "FUSION MEDIATED BY THE HIV-1 ENVELOPE PROTEIN", SUBCELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, XX, XX, (2000), pages 457 - 481, XP002940174 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | International search | [E]US6451598 (GOLDSMITH MARK A [US], et al) |