EP1358609 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COMPLETING A TRANSACTION BETWEEN A CUSTOMER AND A MERCHANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I4 Commerce Inc. 9690 Deereco Road, Suite 705 Timonium, MD 21093 / US | For all designated states Keithly, Thomas H. 1301 Blue Mount Road Monkton, MD 21111 / US | For all designated states Hirschfeld, Daniel A. 1 Sunset Knoll Court Timonium, MD 21093 / US | For all designated states Lavelle, Mark L. 6407 Murray Hill Road Govans, MD 21212 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states I4 Commerce Inc. 9690 Deereco Road, Suite 705 Timonium, MD 21093 / US | ||
For all designated states Keithly, Thomas H. 1301 Blue Mount Road Monkton, MD 21111 / US | |||
For all designated states Hirschfeld, Daniel A. 1 Sunset Knoll Court Timonium, MD 21093 / US | |||
For all designated states Lavelle, Mark L. 6407 Murray Hill Road Govans, MD 21212 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TALBERT, Vincent, W. 10 Forward Court Cockeysville, MD 21030 / US | 02 /
KEITHLY, Thomas, H. 1301 Blue Mount Road Monkton, MD 2111 / US | 03 /
HIRSCHFELD, Daniel, A. 1 Sunset Knoll Court Timonium, MD 21093 / US | 04 /
LAVELLE, Mark, L. 6407 Murray Hill Road Govans, MD 21212 / US | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Barton, Matthew Thomas, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Barton, Matthew Thomas, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/12] | Barton, Matthew Thomas, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/45] | Carstairs, J. C. Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02714853.5 | 07.02.2002 | [2003/45] | WO2002US03743 | Priority number, date | US20010266995P | 07.02.2001 Original published format: US 266995 P | US20010275494P | 13.03.2001 Original published format: US 275494 P | US20010328964P | 12.10.2001 Original published format: US 328964 P | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02063432 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1358609 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
G06Q40/02 (EP);
G06Q20/02 (EP);
G06Q20/04 (EP);
G06Q20/12 (EP);
G06Q20/403 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM VERVOLLSTÄNDIGEN EINER TRANSAKTION ZWISCHEN EINEM KUNDEN UND EINEM HÄNDLER | [2003/45] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COMPLETING A TRANSACTION BETWEEN A CUSTOMER AND A MERCHANT | [2003/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME SERVANT A EXECUTER UNE TRANSACTION ENTRE UN CLIENT ET UN VENDEUR | [2003/45] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 20.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/22] | 18.10.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.04.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/22] | Appeal following examination | 15.12.2010 | Appeal received No. T0552/11 | 25.02.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.04.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | EP10178191.2 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 23.10.2010 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 08.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 08.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5793028 (WAGENER CARL S [ZA], et al) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * column 1, line 28 - line 48 * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 22 *; | [X]WO0002150 (WEBCARD INC [VU], et al) [X] 1-26* abstract *; | [X]US6029150 (KRAVITZ DAVID WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * column 7, line 9 - line 67 * | International search | [X]US6029150 ; | [XE]US2002035538 ; | [XE]US2002069166 ; | [XE]US2002087467 ; | [A]WO0002150 |