EP1384155 - SPECTRAL KERNELS FOR LEARNING MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Health Discovery Corporation 6709 Waters Avenue Savannah, GA 31406 / US | [2006/33] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Memorial Health Trust, Inc. 4700 Waters Avenue Savannah, GA 31404 / US | ||
For all designated states Stern, Julian N. 275 Middlefield Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
For all designated states Roberts, James 415 Whitehall Lane Richmond Hill, GA 31324 / US | |||
For all designated states Paderewski, Jules B. 3 Peregrin Crossing Savannah, GA 31411 / US | |||
For all designated states Farley, Peter J. 59 Damonte Parkway, Suite 310 Reno, NV 89521 / US | |||
For all designated states Anderson, Curtis 44 Delegal Road Savannah, GA 31411 / US | |||
For all designated states Matthews, John E. 9 Devon Road Savannah, GA 31419 / US | |||
For all designated states Simpson, K. Russell 3 Modena Island Drive Savannah, GA 31411 / US | |||
For all designated states O'Hayer, Timothy P. 9 West Ferry Court Savannah, GA 31411 / US | |||
For all designated states Bergeron, Glynn 1421 Cedar Grove Plantation Drive Savannah, GA 31419 / US | |||
For all designated states Carls, Garry L. 1619 Chatham Avenue Tybee Island, GA 31328 / US | |||
For all designated states McKenzie, Joe 425 Buckhalter Road Savannah, GA 31405 / US | |||
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Biowulf Technologies, LLC Suite 200, 532 Stephenson Avenue Savannah, GA 31405 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRISTIANINI, Nello 1439 Hearst Avenue Berkeley, CA 94702 / US | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Pratt, David Martin, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Pratt, David Martin, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02715025.9 | 01.03.2002 | [2004/05] | WO2002US06465 | Priority number, date | US20010272391P | 01.03.2001 Original published format: US 272391 P | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02071243 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1384155 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/62, G06F15/18 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G06F18/22 (EP,US);
G06F18/2323 (EP,US);
G06N20/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/05] | G06F15/16, G06F17/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEKTRALKERNE FÜR LERNENDE MASCHINEN | [2004/05] | English: | SPECTRAL KERNELS FOR LEARNING MACHINES | [2004/05] | French: | NOYAUX SPECTRAUX POUR MACHINES A APPRENDRE | [2004/05] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 09.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/33] | 27.03.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.04.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - BERNHARD SCHÖLKOPF ET AL, "Input Space Versus Feature Space in Kernel-Based Methods", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NEURAL NETWORKS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199909), vol. 10, no. 5, ISSN 1045-9227, XP011039375 [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 1002, column R - page 1003, column L * * page 1004, column R - page 1005, column L * * page 1008, column L, paragraph 7 - page 1010, column L, paragraph 1 * | [A] - CHARLES D ET AL, "Kernel factor analysis with varimax rotation", NEURAL NETWORKS, 2000. IJCNN 2000, PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE-INNS-ENNS INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON 24-27 JULY 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20000724), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7695-0619-4, pages 381 - 386, XP010506753 [A] 1-17 * abstract * * section 3 * | [A] - SCHÖLKOPF B ET AL, "Kernel principal component analysis", ARTIFICIAL NEURAL NETWORKS - ICANN '97. 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS SPRINGER-VERLAG BERLIN, GERMANY, (1997), ISBN 3-540-63631-5, pages 583 - 588, XP002413788 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - JIANBO SHI ET AL, "Normalized cuts and image segmentation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE IEEE COMPUT. SOC USA, (200008), vol. 22, no. 8, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 888 - 905, XP002413789 [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 892, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.868688 | International search | [Y]US5587922 (HENDRICKSON BRUCE A [US], et al); | [A]US5747810 (SCHOTLAND JOHN CARL [US]); | [A]US5758653 (SCHOTLAND JOHN CARL [US]); | [A]US5762607 (SCHOTLAND JOHN CARL [US], et al); | [A]US5787888 (SCHOTLAND JOHN CARL [US]); | [A]US5832922 (SCHOTLAND JOHN CARL [US]); | [Y]US6038197 (SITTON GARY A [US], et al); | [A] - HAROLD R.U ZATZZ, "Galerkin radiosity: A higher order solution method for global illumination", CORNELL PROGRAM OF COMPUTER GRAPHICS (ACM-0-89791-601-8/93/008), (1993), pages 213 - 220, XP002950556 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/166117.166145 | [YP] - XIANG SEAN ZHOU, THOMAS S. HUANG, BECKMAN INSTITUTE (ACM 1-581 13-394-4/01/0009), UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS AT URBANA CHAMPAIGN, (2001), pages 137 - 146, XP002950555 | [A] - S.C. SAHASRABUDHE, A.D. KULLARNI, "On solving fredholm integral equations of the first kind", JOURNAL OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, INDIAN INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, BOMBAY, INDIA, (197710), vol. 24, no. 4, pages 624 - 629, XP002950554 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/322033.322041 | [Y] - SOO-CHANG PEI, MIN-HUNG YEH AND CHIEN-CHENG TSENG, "Discrete fractional fourier transform based on orthogonal projections", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (199905), vol. 47, no. 5, pages 1335 - 1348, XP002950553 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.757221 |