EP1349615 - FIRE-FIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fogtec Brandschutz GmbH & Co. KG Schanzenstrasse 19a 51063 Köln / DE | [2003/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPRAKEL, Dirk Magnusstrasse 3 50672 Köln / DE | 02 /
LAIBACH, Dirk Krutscheider Weg 112 42327 Wuppertal / DE | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Simons, Johannes Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Simons, Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8 A 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02715424.4 | 14.01.2002 | [2003/41] | WO2002EP00270 | Priority number, date | DE2001101490 | 12.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10101490 | [2003/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02055154 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1349615 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1349615 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A62C35/60 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
A62C35/605 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2003/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BRANDBEKÄMPFUNG | [2003/41] | English: | FIRE-FIGHTING DEVICE | [2003/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LUTTE CONTRE LES INCENDIES | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 19.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.11.2004 | GB | 03.11.2004 | NL | 03.11.2004 | BE | 31.01.2005 | [2006/32] |
Former [2006/14] | GB | 03.11.2004 | |
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | GB | 03.11.2004 | |
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4552221 (KLEIN WILFRIED [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0873766 (TOTAL FEUERSCHUTZ GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19930481 (PREUSSAG AG MINIMAX [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19930482 (PREUSSAG AG MINIMAX [DE]) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | Examination | DE19522495 |