EP1467223 - RADAR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | ||
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURODA, Hiroshi, Hitachi, Ltd., IP Group 12th Fl., Marunouchi Cent.Bldg., 6-1,Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
TAKANO, Kazuaki, Hitachi, Ltd., IP Group 12th Fl., Marunouchi Cent.Bldg., 6-1,Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
OKAI, Fumihiko Hitachi, Ltd., IP Group 12th Fl., Marunouchi Cent.Bldg., 6-1,Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
KURODA, Hiroshi, Hitachi, Ltd., IP Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKANO, Kazuaki, Hitachi, Ltd., IP Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
03 /
OKAI, Fumihiko Hitachi, Ltd., IP Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
Former [2004/42] | 01 /
KURODA, Hiroshi, Hitachi, Ltd., Intell.Prop.Group New Marunouchi Bldg.5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKANO, Kazuaki, Hitachi, Ltd., Intell.Prop.Group New Marunouchi Bldg.5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
03 /
OKAI, Fumihiko Hitachi, Ltd., Intell.Prop.Group New Marunouchi Bldg.5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02715805.4 | 18.01.2002 | [2004/42] | WO2002JP00317 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03062852 | Date: | 31.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1467223 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1467223 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/93, G01S13/34, G01S7/40 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
G01S7/4034 (EP,US);
G01S7/4026 (EP,US);
G01S7/4056 (EP,US);
G01S13/345 (EP,US);
G01S13/931 (EP,US);
G01S2013/932 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/42] | G01S13/93, G01S13/34 | Designated contracting states | DE [2007/37] |
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RADAREINRICHTUNG | [2004/42] | English: | RADAR DEVICE | [2004/42] | French: | SYSTEME RADAR | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2004 | Translation filed | 09.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 29.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6026353 (WINNER HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1-6* column 2, line 19 - line 36; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]US5731779 (KIKUCHI HAYATO [JP]); | [A]US6020844 (BAI JIE [JP], et al); | [A]US6157294 (URAI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]JP2002006032 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) |