EP1358082 - VEHICLE SUSPENSION ROLL CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/45] | VEHICULE SUSPENSION ROLL CONTROL SYSTEM | ||
[2009/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kinetic Pty Limited 9 Clark Street Dunsborough, W.A. 6281 / AU | [2003/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNDAY, Raymond, Andrew 8 Chieftain Crescent Dunsborough, W.A. 6281 / AU | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | HGF 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Ajello, Michael John Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11C Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | ||
Former [2003/45] | Ajello, Michael John Harrison, Goddard, Foote, 11c Compstall Road, Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02715970.6 | 10.01.2002 | [2003/45] | WO2002AU00028 | Priority number, date | AU2001PR02499 | 10.01.2001 Original published format: AU PR249901 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02055327 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1358082 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1358082 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.07.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60G21/06, B60G21/073 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
B60G21/06 (EP,US);
B60G2202/154 (EP,US);
B60G2204/81 (EP,US);
B60G2204/82 (EP,US);
B60G2204/8304 (EP,US);
B60G2204/8306 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/45] | B60G17/048, B60G21/06, B60G21/067 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WANKSTABILISIERUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUGFAHRWERK | [2009/33] | English: | VEHICLE SUSPENSION ROLL CONTROL SYSTEM | [2009/34] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONTROLE DU ROULIS D'UNE SUSPENSION DE VEHICULE | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/45] | WANKSTEUERSYSTEM FÜR FAHRZEUGAUFHÄNGUNG | ||
Former [2003/45] | VEHICULE SUSPENSION ROLL CONTROL SYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 07.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 29.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 25.02.2010 | [2011/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08169224 ; | [A]FR1256864 (VOLVO AB) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]DE1112907 (BOGE GMBH) [A] 1-14* figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE1947232 (ROESSNER HANS DIPL ING) [A] 1-14 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE4406650 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US5915701 (HEYRING CHRISTOPHER B [AU]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]WO0030879 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08169224 A 19960702 (TOKICO LTD) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH08169224 ; | [A]EP0818332 (DELPHI FRANCE AUTOMOTIVE SYS [FR]); | [A]EP1022169 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 36, Database accession no. 1996-357953, XP002992834 & JPH08169224 A 19960702 (TOKICO LTD.) |