EP1395938 - COMPUTER-ASSISTED MEANS FOR ASSESSING LIFESTYLE RISK FACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sciona Limited 79 George Street Ryde Isle of Wight P033 2JF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Sciona Limited 79 George Street Ryde, Isle of Wight P033 2JF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILL-GARRISON, Rosalynn Dianne, Sciona Limited 79 George Street Ryde, Isle of Wight PO33 2JF / GB | 02 /
MARTIN, Christopher John, Sciona Limited 79 George Street Ryde, Isle of Wight PO33 2JF / GB | 03 /
SANCHEZ-FELIX, Manuel Vicente, Sciona Limited 79 George Street Ryde, Isle of Wight PO33 2JF / GB | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02716200.7 | 30.01.2002 | [2004/11] | WO2002GB00418 | Priority number, date | US20010771933 | 30.01.2001 Original published format: US 771933 | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02061659 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1395938 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
G16H10/40 (EP,US);
G09B19/0092 (US);
G09B5/02 (US);
G16B25/10 (EP,US);
G16B40/00 (EP,US);
G16B40/10 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H20/70 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
G16B25/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RECHNERUNTERSTÜTZTES SYSTEM ZUR LEBENSSTILSRISIKOFAKTORENBESTIMMUNG | [2004/11] | English: | COMPUTER-ASSISTED MEANS FOR ASSESSING LIFESTYLE RISK FACTORS | [2004/11] | French: | SYSTEME INFORMATISE POUR L'EVALUATION DES FACTEURS DE RISQUE LIES AU STYLE DE VIE | [2004/11] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   16.02.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0382261 (VIRGINIA MASON RES CENTER [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 3, line 10 - line 50 * * page 4, line 25 - page 8, line 37 *; | [A]US5550021 (BLUM KENNETH [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 10, line 46 - column 14, line 20 * * column 15, line 55 - column 31, line 63 *; | [A]WO9718009 (GENELINK INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 1, line 7 - page 4, line 10 *; | [X]US5920871 (MACRI VINCENT J [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 3, line 32 - column 5, line 59 * * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 4 * * column 7, line 20 - column 9, line 64 * * column 10, line 23 - column 13, line 44 * * column 17, line 41 - column 18, line 6 *; | [X]US5985559 (BROWN STEPHEN J [US]) [X] 1-12 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 26 * * column 6, line 30 - column 7, line 53 *; | [A]US6046317 (KOULU MARKKU [FI], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 21 - column 7, line 11 *; | [A] - ""Bricks and Mortar" Addition to Concept with Opening of Retail and Mobile Units: Screening Results Downloaded Directly to Secure, Online Personal Health Record", HEALTHSCREENAMERICA PRESS RELEASE, Jacksonville, Florida, USA, (19991222), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.HealthScreenAmerica.com, (20030724), XP002249014 [A] 1-12 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 16 * * page 2, line 30 - line 56 * | [A] - "Purchase Home Bases DNA Test", HOME BASED DNA TEST KIT PRESS RELEASE, (19990324), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.D-FWMall.com, (20030724), XP002249015 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - B. GOLDMAN, "Patient, Diagnose Thyself", SIGNALS MAGAZINE, (20010102), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://www.signalsmag.com, (20030724), XP002249016 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |