EP1355756 - CUTTING INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iscar Ltd. P.O. Box 11 24959 Tefen / IL | [2006/37] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states New Iscar Ltd. P.O. Box 11 24959 Tefen / IL | ||
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states ISCAR LTD. P.O. Box 11 Tefen 24959 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATRAN, Amir Moran Street 6 25147 Kfar Vradim / IL | 02 /
ULIANITSKY, Daniel Levi Eshkol Street 444, Apartment 26 21033 Maalot-Tarshiha / IL | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/44] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02716293.2 | 23.01.2002 | [2003/44] | WO2002IL00065 | Priority number, date | IL20010141089 | 25.01.2001 Original published format: IL 14108901 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02058873 | Date: | 01.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1355756 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1355756 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/22 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
B23C5/2213 (EP,US);
B23C5/10 (KR);
B23C2200/125 (EP,US);
B23C2200/128 (EP,US);
B23C2210/168 (EP,US);
Y10T407/191 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEINSATZ | [2003/44] | English: | CUTTING INSERT | [2003/44] | French: | PLAQUETTE DE COUPE | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.06.2008 | GR | 19.09.2008 | IE | 23.01.2009 | LU | 23.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | [2023/28] |
Former [2011/44] | CY | 18.06.2008 | |
GR | 19.09.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2009 | ||
LU | 23.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2011/32] | GR | 19.09.2008 | |
IE | 23.01.2009 | ||
LU | 23.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | GR | 19.09.2008 | |
IE | 23.01.2009 | ||
IT | 23.01.2009 | ||
LU | 23.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | GR | 19.09.2008 | |
IE | 23.01.2009 | ||
IT | 23.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | GR | 19.09.2008 | |
IE | 23.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | IE | 23.01.2009 | |
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | MC | 31.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0534450 (ISCAR LTD [IL]); | [A]EP0555192 (SANDVIK AB [SE]) [A] 1,5,6,8-10,12-15 * column 2, line 54 - column 5, line 58; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0587109 (ISCAR LTD [IL]); | [A]US5443334 (PANTZAR GOERAN [SE]); | [A]US5685670 (SATRAN AMIR [IL]) |