EP1364357 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SIMULATION OF A THREAD IN COMPUTER GRAPHICS SIMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simsurgery AS Sognsvn. 75b 0855 Oslo / NO | [2003/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAASA, Johannes Grindbakken 30 N-0764 OSLO / NO | 02 /
STROM, Kyrre Stavangergata 37 N-0467 OSLO / NO | 03 /
WESTGAARD, Geir Harald Haarfagresvei 38k N-1412 SOFIEMYR / NO | 04 /
ROTNES, Jan, Sigurd Myrvoldveien 18c N-1415 OPPEGARD / NO | [2006/12] |
Former [2003/48] | 01 /
KAASA, Johannes Grindbakken 30 N-0764 OSLO / NO | ||
02 /
STROM, Kyrre Stavangergata 37 N-0467 OSLO / NO | |||
03 /
WESTGAARD, Geir Harald Haarfagresvei 38k N-1412 SOFIEMYR / NO | |||
04 /
ROTNES, Jan, Sigurd Myrvoldveien 18c N-1415 OPPEG RD / NO | Representative(s) | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02716497.9 | 08.01.2002 | [2003/48] | WO2002NO00009 | Priority number, date | NO20010000127 | 08.01.2001 Original published format: NO 20010127 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02054370 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1364357 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1364357 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/00 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
G09B23/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/48] | G09B23/04, G09B23/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SIMULATION EINES FADENS IN COMPUTERGRAFIKSIMULATIONEN | [2005/36] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SIMULATION OF A THREAD IN COMPUTER GRAPHICS SIMULATIONS | [2003/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE SIMULATION D'UN FIL DANS DES SIMULATIONS GRAPHIQUES INFORMATIQUES | [2003/48] |
Former [2003/48] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SIMULATION EINES THREAD IN COMPUTERGRAFIKSIMULATIONEN | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 12.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2006 | BE | 22.03.2006 | CY | 22.03.2006 | FI | 22.03.2006 | IT | 22.03.2006 | NL | 22.03.2006 | TR | 22.03.2006 | DK | 22.06.2006 | SE | 22.06.2006 | GR | 23.06.2006 | ES | 03.07.2006 | PT | 22.08.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CY | 22.03.2006 | ||
FI | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
FI | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 22.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9204860 (MEDSIM INC [US]); | [X]WO9824083 (SHAHIAR DADKHAH [US]); | [X]US5956040 (ASANO TAKEO [JP], et al) |