EP1492649 - INDUSTRIAL ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB AB Kopparbergsvägen 2 721 83 Västerås / SE | [2009/10] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states ABB AB Kopparbergsvägen 2 721 83 Västeras / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROGARDH, Torgny Plätverksgatan 140 724 79 Västeräs / SE | 02 /
SKUTBERG, Hans Smultronvägen 21 831 62 Östersund / SE | 03 /
VALLIN, Asa Bordsvägen 35 122 46 Enskede / SE | 04 /
ANDREASSON, Mathilda Tuppfjätsgatan 2 421 36 Västra Frölunda / SE | 05 /
LUNDBERG, Ivan Ibsengatan 80 168 47 Bromma / SE | [2005/01] | Application number, filing date | 02716504.2 | 16.01.2002 | [2005/01] | WO2002SE00075 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03059581 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1492649 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1492649 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/10, B25J17/02, B25J18/06 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
B25J17/0266 (EP,US);
B23Q1/5462 (EP,US);
B25J9/0072 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20329 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INDUSTRIEROBOTER | [2005/01] | English: | INDUSTRIAL ROBOT | [2005/01] | French: | ROBOT INDUSTRIEL | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 05.07.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 26.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 16.08.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.03.2009 | BE | 04.03.2009 | CY | 04.03.2009 | DK | 04.03.2009 | FI | 04.03.2009 | NL | 04.03.2009 | TR | 04.03.2009 | SE | 04.06.2009 | GR | 05.06.2009 | PT | 19.08.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/37] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
CY | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | FI | 04.03.2009 | |
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 04.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5156062 (APPLEBERRY WALTER T [US]); | [A]US5219266 (REBOULET CLAUDE [FR], et al); | [A]FR2739801 (LESEURE MICHEL [FR]); | [A]JPH09186216 (SONY CORP); | [A]US5847528 (HUI RAYMOND CHUNG-YING [CA], et al); | [A]WO9914018 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE], et al) | by applicant | US4651589 | WO9958301 |