EP1461286 - DIFFERENTIAL STRESS REDUCTION IN THIN FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty Limited 393 Darling Street P.O. Box 207 Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited 393 Darling Street, P.O. Box 207 Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | ||
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited 393 Darling Street, P.O. Box 207 Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVERBROOK, Kia Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd 393 Darling Street Balmain, New South Wales 2041 / AU | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road Citywest Business Campus Dublin D24 C56E / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 02716555.4 | 02.05.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002AU00537 | Priority number, date | AU20010009197 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: AU 2001009197 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03045836 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1461286 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1461286 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 05.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B81B3/00, B81C1/00, C30B29/68, H01L21/20, C30B23/02, C23C14/06, C23C14/02 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
B81C1/00666 (EP);
B81B3/00 (KR);
B81C1/00 (KR);
C23C14/024 (EP);
C23C14/0641 (EP);
C30B23/02 (EP);
C30B29/38 (EP);
C30B29/605 (EP);
H01L21/20 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C30B23/02, C30B29/38 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/40] | B81B3/00, B81C1/00, C30B29/68, H01L21/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIFFERENTIALSPANNUNGSVERMINDERUNG IN DÜNNFILMEN | [2004/40] | English: | DIFFERENTIAL STRESS REDUCTION IN THIN FILMS | [2004/40] | French: | REDUCTION DE LA CONTRAINTE DIFFERENTIELLE DANS DES FILMS MINCES | [2004/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 22.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.08.2007 | BE | 08.08.2007 | CH | 08.08.2007 | CY | 08.08.2007 | DK | 08.08.2007 | FI | 08.08.2007 | LI | 08.08.2007 | NL | 08.08.2007 | TR | 08.08.2007 | SE | 08.11.2007 | GR | 09.11.2007 | ES | 19.11.2007 | PT | 08.01.2008 | FR | 04.04.2008 | LU | 02.05.2008 | [2012/40] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
TR | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
LU | 02.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
LU | 02.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 08.08.2007 | |
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 08.08.2007 | |
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 19.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS61225816 ; | [A]JPH02266516 ; | [A]EP0455526 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]EP0735586 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [A]US6087726 (HSIA SHOULI STEVE [US], et al); | [A]US6114198 (HUANG SEN-HUAN [TW], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP61225816 A 19861007 (SHARP CORP) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP02266516 A 19901031 (HITACHI CABLE LTD) | Examination | WO0108225 |