EP1390453 - EMULSIFIERS, ESPECIALLY BASED ON POLYISOBUTYLENAMINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÜFFER, Stephan Luitpoldstr. 19 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
MOCK-KNOBLAUCH, Cordula Prinzregentenstr. 43 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
SCHÜRMANN, Gregor Keplerstr. 17 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | 04 /
LANGE, Arno Oberes Gaistal 3b 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | Isenbruck, Günter, Dr., et al Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn, Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 02716818.6 | 28.02.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002EP02197 | Priority number, date | DE20011009845 | 01.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10109845 | [2004/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02070633 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1390453 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/22 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
C10L10/08 (EP,US);
C09K23/017 (EP,US);
C09K23/14 (EP,US);
C09K23/16 (EP,US);
C09K23/22 (EP,US);
C10L1/143 (EP,US);
C10L1/224 (EP,US);
C10L1/2383 (EP,US);
C10L1/2387 (EP,US);
C10L1/2437 (EP,US);
C10L1/2475 (EP,US);
C10L1/2641 (EP,US);
C10L1/2658 (EP,US);
C10L1/2683 (EP,US);
C10L1/328 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EMULGATOREN, INSBESONDERE AUF BASIS VON POLYISOBUTYLENAMINEN | [2004/09] | English: | EMULSIFIERS, ESPECIALLY BASED ON POLYISOBUTYLENAMINES | [2004/09] | French: | EMULSIFIANTS, EN PARTICULIER A BASE D'AMINES DE POLYISOBUTYLENE | [2004/09] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 03.11.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH11246499 ; | [X]JPH10175935 ; | [PX]JP2001254095 ; | [PX]JP2001172669 ; | [X]US2845407 (WATANABE WARREN H, et al) [X] 6 * column 1, line 69 - column 2, line 26 *; | [X]US3946074 (ABRAMITIS WALTER W) [X] 5 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 9; table 1 *; | [Y]US4536339 (RITSCHEL WERNER [DE], et al) [Y] 8-14 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 11 *; | [XY]WO9625388 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,7,8,13,14 * page 2, line 18 - page 6, line 18 * * page 7, line 23 - line 37; claim 14 * [Y] 8-14; | [X]WO9918177 (RECKITT & COLMAN FRANCE [FR], et al) [X] 1,7,8,13,14 * page 4, line 9 - line 27; example 2 *; | [PX]WO0119945 (RWE DEA AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1,7,8,13,14* page 18, line 25 - page 19, line 8; claim 19 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11246499 A 19990914 (KANEBO LTD) [X] 1,7,8,13,14 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10175935 A 19980630 (LION CORP) [X] 1,7,8,13,14 * abstract * | [X] - MICICH T J ET AL, "WETTING PROPERTIES OF NONIONICS FROM BRANCHED FATTY DIAMIDES", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY. CHAMPAIGN, US, (19880501), vol. 65, no. 5, ISSN 0003-021X, pages 820 - 825, XP000561210 [X] 1,7,8,13,14 * page 820 - page 823; tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02542540 | [X] - TOMALIA, D.A.; FALK, J.C., "The Synthesis and Reactions of b-substituted ethyl sulfates", J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM., (197208), vol. 9, pages 891 - 894, XP002243544 [X] 6 * example 11; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570090424 | [X] - JACOBY, A.L., "Polyamide antifoams", J.PHYS. CHEM., (1948), vol. 52, pages 689 - 694, XP002243545 [X] 5 * page 691; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/j150460a004 | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020701), vol. 2000, no. 26, & JP2001254095 A 20010918 (LION CORP) [PX] 1,7,8,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0055] * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010210), vol. 2000, no. 23, & JP2001172669 A 20010626 (LION CORP) [PX] 1,7,8,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * |