EP1490078 - HEPATOCURATIVE EFFECT OF EMBLICA OFFICINALIS ON HEPATOTOXICITY RELATED TO CYTOCHROME P-450 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Council of Scientific and Industrial Research Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Council of Scientific and Industrial Research Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johri, Rakesh Kamal Regional Research Laboratory Jammu, Canal Road Jammu 180 001 / IN | 02 /
Abdullah, Sheikh Tasaduq Regional Research Laboratory Jammu, Canal Road Jammu 180 001 / IN | 03 /
Singh, Kuldeep Regional Research Laboratory Jammu, Canal Road Jammu 180 001 / IN | 04 /
Gupta, Devinder Kumar Regional Research Laboratory Jammu, Canal Road Jammu 180 001 / IN | 05 /
Kapahi, Bal Krishan Regional Research Laboratory Jammu, Canal Road Jammu 180 001 / IN | 06 /
Mondhe, Dilip Manikrao Regional Research Laboratory Jammu, Canal Road Jammu 180 001 / IN | 07 /
Jain, Satinder Mohan Regional Research Laboratory Jammu, Canal Road Jammu 180 001 / IN | 08 /
Suri, Om Parkash Regional Research Laboratory Jammu, Canal Road Jammu 180 001 / IN | 09 /
Bedi, Kasturi Lal Regional Research Laboratory Jammu, Canal Road Jammu 180 001 / IN | 10 /
Qazi, Ghulam Nabi Regional Research Laboratory Jammu, Canal Road Jammu 180 001 / IN | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02716955.6 | 26.03.2002 | [2005/01] | WO2002IB00635 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03080090 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1490078 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/78 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A61K36/47 (EP,KR);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/47, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEBERHEILENDE WIRKUNG VON EMBLICA OFFICINALIS AUF MIT ZYTOCHROM P-450 ZUSAMMENHÄNGENDE LEBERTOXIZITÄT | [2005/01] | English: | HEPATOCURATIVE EFFECT OF EMBLICA OFFICINALIS ON HEPATOTOXICITY RELATED TO CYTOCHROME P-450 | [2005/01] | French: | EFFET HEPATOCURATIF D'EMBLICA OFFICINALIS SUR L'HEPATOTOXICITE ASSOCIEE AU CYTOCHROME P-450 | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 10.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 20.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/52] | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | Appeal following examination | 21.12.2007 | Appeal received No. T0844/08 | 22.02.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.10.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2012 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - HAQUE R ET AL, "Protective effects of Emblica officinalis Gaertn. in cyclophosphamide-treated mice.", HUMAN & EXPERIMENTAL TOXICOLOGY, (200112), vol. 20, no. 12, ISSN 0960-3271, pages 643 - 650, XP008005023 [X] 1-7,11-13,15,18,20,21,26-29,36-38 * Abstract * * page 648, column R * * page 649, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1191/096032701718890568 | [X] - UDUPA VENKATESHA ET AL, "Effect of HD-03 on levels of various enzymes in paracetamol-induced liver damage in rats.", INDIAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (200012), vol. 32, no. 6, ISSN 0253-7613, pages 361 - 364, XP008005025 [X] 1-6,11-13,15,18,20-22,24,26-30,36,38 * page 363, Discussion * | [X] - SHARMA NIDHI ET AL, "In vitro inhibition of carcinogen-induced mutagenicity by Cassia occidentalis and Emblica officinalis.", DRUG AND CHEMICAL TOXICOLOGY AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL FOR RAPID, August, 2000, (200008), vol. 23, no. 3, ISSN 0148-0545, pages 477 - 484, XP008005026 [X] 1-7,11-13,15,20,21,26-28 * Abstract * * page 481 - 482, Discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/DCT-100100129 | [X] - SHARMA N ET AL, "Inhibitory effect of Emblica officinalis on the in vivo clastogenicity of benzo(a)pyrene and cyclophosphamide in mice.", HUMAN & EXPERIMENTAL TOXICOLOGY, (200006), vol. 19, no. 6, ISSN 0960-3271, pages 377 - 384, XP008005045 [X] 1-6,11-15,18-21,24,26-29,36-38 * page 382, Discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1191/096032700678815945 | [X] - JOSE JEENA K ET AL, "Hepatoprotective activity of Emblica officinalis and Chyavanaprash.", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, (200009), vol. 72, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-8741, pages 135 - 140, XP002203394 [X] 1-6,15,18,20-22,24,26-28,32,36,38 * Abstract * * Materials and Methods * * page 139, Discussion (last paragraph) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-8741(00)00219-1 | [X] - JEENA K JOSE ET AL, "Effect of Emblica officinalis, Phyllanthus amarus and Picrorrhiza kurroa on N-nitrosodiethylamine induced hepatocarcinogenesis.", CANCER LETTERS, (19990206), vol. 136, no. 1, ISSN 0304-3835, pages 11 - 16, XP002203395 [X] 1-6,15,18,20,21,24,26-28,32,36-38 * Abstract * * page 12, paragraphs 2.1 and 2.5 * * page 15, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3835(98)00294-8 | Examination | JPH1028549 | - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 15, Database accession no. 1998-162497, & JPH1028549 A 19980203 (INAHATA KORYO KK) | - DOTY S.L. ET AL, "Enhanced metabolism of halogenated hydrocarbons in transgenic plants containing mammalian cytochrome P450 2E1", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (2000), vol. 97, no. 12, pages 6287 - 6291 | - YAMAZAKI H. ET AL, "Participation of rat liver cytochrome P450 2E1 in the activation of N-nitrosodimethylamine and N-nitrosodiethylamine to products genotoxic in an acetyltransferase-overexpressing Salmonella typhimurium strain (NM2009)", CARCINOGENESIS, (1992), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 979 - 985, XP009089415 |