EP1565332 - VEHICLE SUSPENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hendrickson USA, L.L.C. 500 Park Boulevard Suite 1010 Itasca, IL 60143 / US | [2010/15] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states Hendrickson International Corporation 500 Park Boulevard Suite 1010 Itasca, IL 60143 / US | ||
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states The Boler Company 500 Park Boulevard Itasca Illinois 60143 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUDDING, Ashley, Thomas 5010 Saint Andrews Drive Plainfield, IL 60544 / US | 02 /
FORREST, Christopher, Wayne 207 Yukon Pass Auburn, IN 46706 / US | 03 /
STUART, John Wayne 1530 South State Street, No. 907 Chicago, IL 60605 / US | 04 /
THOMAS, Jason, Steby 2937 West Howard Chicago, IL 60645 / US | 05 /
MARQUEZ, Pedro, Ramses, Banda 5848 South Walnut Avenue Downers Grove, IL 60516 / US | 06 /
DANKOW, Mark, William 9305 Wallen Court Ft. Wayne, IN 46845 / US | 07 /
JABLE, Roger D. 2052 Mustang Drive Naperville, Illinois 60565 / US | [2006/01] |
Former [2005/34] | 01 /
DUDDING, Ashley, Thomas 5010 Saint Andrews Drive Plainfield, IL 60544 / US | ||
02 /
FORREST, Christopher, Wayne 207 Yukon Pass Auburn, IN 46706 / US | |||
03 /
STUART, John Wayne 1530 South State Street, No. 907 Chicago, IL 60605 / US | |||
04 /
THOMAS, Jason, Steby 2937 West Howard Chicago, IL 60645 / US | |||
05 /
MARQUEZ, Pedro, Ramses, Banda 5848 South Walnut Avenue Downers Grove, IL 60516 / US | |||
06 /
DANKOW, Mark, William 9305 Wallen Court Ft. Wayne, IN 46845 / US | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02717485.3 | 21.02.2002 | [2005/34] | WO2002US05351 | Priority number, date | US20010793740 | 26.02.2001 Original published format: US 793740 | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02068227 | Date: | 06.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1565332 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1565332 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60G1/00 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
B60G9/00 (EP,US);
B60G2200/314 (EP,US);
B60G2200/315 (EP,US);
B60G2200/341 (EP,US);
B60G2202/136 (EP,US);
B60G2202/152 (EP,US);
B60G2204/126 (EP,US);
B60G2204/128 (EP,US);
B60G2204/143 (EP,US);
B60G2204/1482 (EP,US);
B60G2204/416 (EP,US);
B60G2204/4302 (EP,US);
B60G2204/4306 (EP,US);
B60G2204/4502 (EP,US);
B60G2206/124 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/34] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGAUFHÄNGUNG | [2005/34] | English: | VEHICLE SUSPENSION | [2005/34] | French: | SUSPENSION DE VEHICULE | [2005/34] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/15] | 10.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 10.09.2004 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 06.05.2005 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 16.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10160414.8 / EP2230106 | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 31.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.01.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.08.2004 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | CY   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | DK   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | FI   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | IE   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | MC   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | PT   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | 10.08.2004 | TR   M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.08.2004 | M02   Fee paid on   10.09.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2004 | 28.02.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.04.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.04.2010 | CY | 21.04.2010 | DK | 21.04.2010 | FI | 21.04.2010 | TR | 21.04.2010 | GR | 22.07.2010 | ES | 01.08.2010 | PT | 23.08.2010 | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/08] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | ES | 01.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1120450 ; | [X]EP0945289 (LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG [DE]) [X] 1-17* figures 3,4 *; | [X]WO0012330 (NEWAY ANCHORLOK INT INC [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * figure - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11020450 A 19990126 (FUKOKU CO LTD) [X] 1-17 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4518171 (HEDENBERG WILLIAM E [US]); | [X]US5203585 (PIERCE WILLIAM C [US]); | [A]US5427404 (STEPHENS DONALD L [US]); | [XP]US6328322 (PIERCE WILLIAM C [US]) |