EP1409809 - NATURAL STONE PLATE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kellner, Peter Schillerstrasse 3 36269 Phillippsthal / DE | [2004/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Liedtke, Klaus Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 10-11 99096 Erfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Liedtke, Klaus Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 10 99096 Erfurt / DE | ||
Former [2004/17] | Liedtke, Klaus, Dr. Postfach 10 19 16 99019 Erfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 02717944.9 | 08.02.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002DE00462 | Priority number, date | DE2001106602 | 09.02.2001 Original published format: DE 10106602 | DE2001126247 | 29.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10126247 | DE2002101722 | 18.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10201722 | [2004/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02064903 | Date: | 22.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1409809 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1409809 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/26 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
E04F13/144 (EP);
B28D1/005 (EP);
B28D7/04 (EP);
E04C2/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NATURSTEINPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2004/17] | English: | NATURAL STONE PLATE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2004/17] | French: | DALLE EN PIERRE NATURELLE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 31.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.12.2003 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | 06.12.2003 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.12.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   06.12.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.11.2005 | FI | 16.11.2005 | FR | 16.11.2005 | GB | 16.11.2005 | IE | 16.11.2005 | IT | 16.11.2005 | NL | 16.11.2005 | TR | 16.11.2005 | DK | 16.02.2006 | GR | 16.02.2006 | SE | 16.02.2006 | ES | 27.02.2006 | BE | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | PT | 17.04.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/52] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
FR | 16.11.2005 | ||
GB | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
TR | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
GB | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
TR | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2006 | ||
FR | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
GB | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
GB | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
GB | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
IE | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
NL | 16.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE3709224 (KOZUSCHNIK HERBERT [DE]) [Y] 2,4 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 49 *; | [XAY]DE3940102 (LEHNER WOLFGANG [AT], et al) [X] 1,3,5,8,9,11 * column 10, line 35 - column 11, line 62; figures 2,3; claims 1,3 * [A] 7 [Y] 2,4; | [A]EP0631015 (TONCELLI MARCELLO [IT]) [A] 12-14,18-22 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 58; figures 1-5; claims 1-9 *; | [A]CH690065 (ROTHEN WILLY [CH]) [A] 4,25,26,28* column 2, line 64 - column 4, line 45; claim 1 * |