EP1389285 - STRUCTURAL COMPONENTS FOR THE BOILER ZONE OF POWER PLANTS OR REFUSE INCINERATION PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ni-Ko-Tech System GmbH Alter Kiesturm 20 21435 Stelle / DE | For all designated states Baumgarte Boiler Systems GmbH Senner Strasse 115 33647 Bielefeld / DE | [2013/34] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states Ni-Ko-Tech System GmbH Tunnkoppelstieg 1 22359 Hamburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Baumgarte Boiler Systems GmbH Senner Strasse 115 33647 Bielefeld / DE | |||
Former [2004/08] | For all designated states BBP Service GmbH Duisburger Strasse 375 46049 Oberhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANSEY, Johann, Wilhelm Tunnkoppelstieg 1 22359 Hamburg / DE | [2004/08] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Intellectual Property Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2005/49] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/16] | Lüdtke, Frank Patentanwalt Schildhof 13 30853 Langenhagen / DE | ||
Former [2004/08] | Radünz, Ingo, Dipl.-Ing. Schumannstrasse 100 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02718137.9 | 15.02.2002 | [2004/08] | WO2002EP01623 | Priority number, date | DE20011009138 | 26.02.2001 Original published format: DE 10109138 | [2004/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02068863 | Date: | 06.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1389285 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1389285 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F23G5/48, F28F19/06, F22B37/04 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
F23G5/48 (EP,KR,US);
C25D7/00 (KR);
F22B37/04 (EP,KR,US);
F28F19/06 (EP,KR,US);
F23J2900/13001 (EP,KR,US);
F23M2900/05001 (EP,KR,US);
F23M2900/05004 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E20/12 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S428/935 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S588/90 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/12937 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12944 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12979 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/08] | F22B37/04, C25D5/00, C25D3/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/08] | Title | German: | BAUTEILE FÜR DEN KESSELBEREICH VON KRAFTWERKEN ODER MÜLLVERBRENNUNGSANLAGEN | [2004/08] | English: | STRUCTURAL COMPONENTS FOR THE BOILER ZONE OF POWER PLANTS OR REFUSE INCINERATION PLANTS | [2004/08] | French: | COMPOSANTS DESTINÉS A LA ZONE CHAUDIÈRE DE CENTRALES ÉLECTRIQUES OU D'INSTALLATIONS D'INCINÉRATION D'ORDURES | [2013/10] |
Former [2004/08] | COMPOSANTS DESTINES A LA ZONE CHAUDIERE DE CENTRALES ELECTRIQUES OU D'INSTALLATIONS D'INCINERATION D'ORDURES | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/08] | 15.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2006 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 10.07.2013 | IE | 15.02.2014 | LU | 15.02.2014 | [2015/07] |
Former [2014/44] | MC | 10.07.2013 | |
LU | 15.02.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4347429 (WILL FRITZ G) [A] 1-4* column 5, line 20 - column 5, line 41 *; | [X]EP0085135 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * claims 1-4 * * page 3, line 14 - page 3, line 23 *; | [X]US5660705 (MICHAUT BERNARD [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 7 - column 4, line 55 *; | [X]EP0913501 (FRAMATOME SA [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * |