EP1372823 - METHOD FOR THE PURIFICATION OF CORROSIVE GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUMANN, Ewald Neugasse 91 64560 Riedstadt/Erfelden / DE | 02 /
HIMMLER, Wolfgang Leipziger Strasse 2 68799 Reilingen / DE | 03 /
BÜTTNER, Werner Im Erlich 6 64291 Darmstadt/Arheilgen / DE | 04 /
FRITSCH, Harald Im Ankenrod 4 64521 Gross-Gerau / DE | 05 /
SCHMIDT, Hans-Jürgen Fliederstrasse 42 64747 Breuberg/Sandbach / DE | 06 /
HOSTALEK, Martin 44 Coronation Road West 02-01 Singapore 269260 / SG | [2004/01] | Application number, filing date | 02718170.0 | 04.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002EP02295 | Priority number, date | DE2001115345 | 28.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10115345 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02078820 | Date: | 10.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1372823 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1372823 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/22, B01D53/14, C01B7/07, C01B7/19, C01C1/02 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
B01D53/1418 (EP,US);
B01D53/14 (KR);
B01D53/229 (EP,US);
C01B7/0706 (EP,US);
C01B7/195 (EP,US);
C01C1/024 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | B01D53/22, C01B7/07, C01B7/19, C01C1/02, H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUFREINIGUNG VON KORROSIV WIRKENDEN GASEN | [2004/01] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PURIFICATION OF CORROSIVE GASES | [2004/01] | French: | PROCEDE POUR ULTRAPURIFIER DES GAZ A EFFET CORROSIF | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 27.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.05.2014 | DK | 21.05.2014 | ES | 21.05.2014 | FI | 21.05.2014 | IT | 21.05.2014 | MC | 21.05.2014 | NL | 21.05.2014 | SE | 21.05.2014 | TR | 21.05.2014 | GR | 22.08.2014 | PT | 22.09.2014 | [2017/40] |
Former [2015/46] | DK | 21.05.2014 | |
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | DK | 21.05.2014 | |
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | DK | 21.05.2014 | |
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | DK | 21.05.2014 | |
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | ES | 21.05.2014 | |
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | ES | 21.05.2014 | |
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 21.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5749941 (JANSEN ALBERT EDWARD [NL], et al) [X] 1,12 * claims 1,12 *; | [A]WO9639266 (STARTEC VENTURES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 6, line 29 - page 11, line 15; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1065168 (BOC GROUP INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5196616 (LEE KUNG H [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 51; figure . * | [A] - MUKHERJEE, D. ET AL., "Ultrapurification and recycling of hydrofluoric acid etching solutions by reverse osmosis: membrane performance and multicomponent rejection", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19950306), vol. 122, no. 10, Database accession no. 110018g, page 270, XP000662337 [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [ ] - CHEM. ENG. COMMUN., (1994), no. 130, pages 127 - 138 |