EP1394195 - COATING COMPOSITION FOR POLYOLEFIN RESIN AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYO KASEI KOGYO COMPANY LIMITED 2-6, 1-chome, Dojima-Hama, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0004 / JP | [2010/20] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Toyo Kasei Kogyo Company Limited 2-6, 1-chome, Dojima-Hama, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUDA, Takafumi TOYO KASEI KOGYO CO.LTD. Chemicals Research Center 2900, Sone-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-shi, Hyogo 676-0082 / JP | 02 /
MAEKAWA, Shoji TOYO KASEI KOGYO COMPANY LIMITED Chemicals Research Center 2900, Sone-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-0082 / JP | 03 /
SUGIYAMA, Shigeru 1-17-13, Hanakawa, Nishiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 555-0023 / JP | 04 /
AKIYAMA, Shin-ichi 3-3-36, Kusune, Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 577-0006 / JP | [2004/38] |
Former [2004/24] | 01 /
MASUDA, Takafumi TOYO KASEI KOGYO CO.LTD. Chemicals Research Center 2900, Sone-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-shi, Hyogo 676-0082 / JP | ||
02 /
MAEKAWA, Shoji TOYO KASEI KOGYO COMPANY LIMITED Chemicals Research Center 2900, Sone-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-0082 / JP | |||
03 /
SUGIYAMA, Shigeru 1-17-13, Hanakawa, Nishiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 555-0023 / JP | |||
04 /
AKIYAMA, Shin-ichi 4-3-9, Imazunaka, Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 538-0042 / JP | |||
Former [2004/10] | 01 /
MASUDA, T. TOYO KASEI KOGYO COMPANY LIMITED Chemicals Research Center 2900, Sone-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-shi, Hyogo 676-0082 / JP | ||
02 /
MAEKAWA, S. TOYO KASEI KOGYO COMPANY LIMITED Chemicals Research Center 2900, Sone-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-0082 / JP | |||
03 /
SUGIYAMA, Shigeru 1-17-13, Hanakawa, Nishiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 555-0023 / JP | |||
04 /
AKIYAMA, Shin-ichi 4-3-9, Imazunaka, Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 538-0042 / JP | Representative(s) | Hock, Joachim Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Hock, Joachim Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02718518.0 | 10.04.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002JP03564 | Priority number, date | JP20010112485 | 11.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001112485 | [2004/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02083772 | Date: | 24.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1394195 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1394195 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/00, C08F290/04, C08F290/12, C09D4/06, C08J7/04, C08F8/00 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
C08F290/042 (EP,US);
C08F255/02 (EP,US);
C08F290/122 (EP,US);
C08F8/14 (EP,US);
C08F8/22 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C09D151/06 (EP,US);
C08F2800/20 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F255/02, C08F220/06, C08F255/02 (US,EP);
C08F255/02, C08F222/06, C08F255/04 (US,EP);
C08F8/14, C08F8/22, C08F255/00 (EP,US);
C08F8/14, C08F8/22, C08F255/02 (EP,US);
C08F8/14, C08F8/22, C08F255/04 (EP,US);
C08F8/22, C08F255/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2004/10] | C08J5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE [2010/20] |
Former [2004/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR POLYOLEFINHARZ UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2004/10] | English: | COATING COMPOSITION FOR POLYOLEFIN RESIN AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2004/10] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVETEMENT POUR RESINE DE POLYOLEFINE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION AFFERENT | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2003 | Translation filed | 06.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 09.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS61200112 (MITSUBISHI YUKA FINE CHEM); | [A]JPH02124986 (SANYO KOKUSAKU PULP CO); | [A]JPH044272 (SANYO KOKUSAKU PULP CO); | [A]JPH059428 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [X]JPH0859757 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD); | [A]JPH09143422 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11119742 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2000007979 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD) |