EP1380008 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anoto AB Emdalavägen 18 223 69 Lund / SE | [2006/23] |
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states Anoto IP Lic HB Scheelevägen 19C 223 70 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Anoto AB Scheelevägen 19C 223 70 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIEBE, Linus Grönegatan 8 S-222 24 Lund / SE | 02 /
ERICSON, Petter S:t Pauli Kyrkogata 16A S-211 49 Malmö / SE | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Perklev, Karin Cecilia, et al Anoto AB Box 4106 227 22 Lund / SE | [2009/46] |
Former [2007/10] | Perklev, Karin Cecilia, et al Anoto AB Emdalavägen 18 223 69 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2004/03] | Perklev, Karin Cecilia Anoto Group AB, Scheelevägen 19C 223 70 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 02718755.8 | 04.04.2002 | [2004/03] | WO2002SE00660 | Priority number, date | SE20010001208 | 05.04.2001 Original published format: SE 0101208 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02082366 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1380008 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1380008 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
G06F3/0317 (EP);
G06F3/0321 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/03] | G06K19/06, G06K11/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERARBEITEN VON INFORMATIONEN | [2004/03] | English: | METHOD FOR PROCESSING INFORMATION | [2004/03] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2004/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 05.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 18.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2007 | Observations by third parties | 07.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR | Licencee: | LeapFrog Enterprises Inc. 6401 Hollis Street, Suite 150 Emeryville CA 94608-1070 / US | Date: | 30.05.2005 | [2008/08] |
Former [2005/31] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | LeapFrog Enterprises Inc. 6401 Hollis Street, Suite 150 Emeryville CA 94608-1070 / US | ||
Date: | 30.05.2005 | ||
[2008/08] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.02.2008 | BE | 20.02.2008 | CY | 20.02.2008 | DK | 20.02.2008 | FI | 20.02.2008 | NL | 20.02.2008 | TR | 20.02.2008 | IE | 04.04.2008 | LU | 04.04.2008 | CH | 30.04.2008 | LI | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | SE | 20.05.2008 | GR | 21.05.2008 | ES | 31.05.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
TR | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 04.04.2008 | ||
LU | 04.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 04.04.2008 | ||
LU | 04.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 04.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 04.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 31.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9950787 (XEROX CORP [US], et al); | [A]US6106147 (SILVERBROOK KIA [AU]); | [A]US6176427 (ANTOGNINI THOMAS CHARLES [US], et al); | [AE]WO0175779 (ANOTO AB [SE], et al) | Examination | WO0116691 | WO0126034 | WO0171644 | other | US5661506 | US5852434 | - DYMETMAN M; COPPERMAN M, "Intelligent paper", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, (199803), vol. 1375, pages 392 - 406, XP002328425 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BFb0053286 |