EP1434988 - TRANSGENIC KNOCKOUTS OF BACE-1 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 12.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 7000 Portage Road Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 7000 Portage Road Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | |||
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | |||
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
For all designated states PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCONLOGUE, Lisa C. 150 Chapin Lane Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | 02 /
GURNEY, Mark E. Krokhals 5D 110 Reykjavik / IS | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/02] | Adam, Holger, Dr. Kraus & Weisert, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/28] | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02719072.7 | 22.02.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002US05639 | Priority number, date | US20010271092 | 23.02.2001 Original published format: US 271092 | US20010271514 | 26.02.2001 Original published format: US 271514 | US20010293762 | 25.05.2001 Original published format: US 293762 | [2004/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02068955 | Date: | 06.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1434988 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00, A01K67/00 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
A01K67/0276 (EP,US);
A01K2217/072 (EP,US);
A01K2217/075 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/03 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0312 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0393 (EP,US);
C12N2800/30 (EP,US);
C12N2840/203 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/28] | Extension states | AL | 20.08.2003 | LT | 20.08.2003 | LV | 20.08.2003 | MK | 20.08.2003 | RO | 20.08.2003 | SI | 20.08.2003 | Title | German: | TRANSGENE BACE-1-KNOCKOUTS | [2004/28] | English: | TRANSGENIC KNOCKOUTS OF BACE-1 | [2004/28] | French: | ANIMAUX TRANSGENIQUES KNOCKOUT A GENE BACE-1 INACTIVE | [2004/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 24.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.12.2009 | 24.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/15] | 04.12.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/15] | 09.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0047618 (ELAN PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-34 * page 56, line 19 - page 59, line 2; claims 108-111 *; | [X] - CAI H ET AL, "Physiological role of beta-site APP-cleaving enzyme (BACE): generation and characterization of BACE-deficient mice", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (2000), Database accession no. PREV200100087703, XP002350005 [X] 1-12,19-34 * abstract * | [PX] - LUO Y ET AL, "Mice deficient in BACE1, the Alzheimer's beta-secretase, have normal phenotype and abolished beta-amyloid generation.", NATURE NEUROSCIENCE. MAR 2001, (200103), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 1097-6256, pages 231 - 232, XP002350002 [PX] 1-34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/85059 | [PX] - CAI HUAIBIN ET AL, "BACE1 is the major beta-secretase for generation of Abeta peptides by neurons", NATURE NEUROSCIENCE, (200103), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 1097-6256, pages 233 - 234, XP002350003 [PX] 1-34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/85064 | [PX] - ROBERDS S L ET AL, "BACE knockout mice are healthy despite lacking the primary beta-secretase activity in brain: Implications for Alzheimer's disease therapeutics", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (2001), vol. 10, no. 12, ISSN 0964-6906, pages 1317 - 1324, XP002228077 [PX] 1-12,19-34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/10.12.1317 | [ ] - SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, 30TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF NEUROSCIENCE; NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA; NOVEMBER 04-09, 2000, (2000), vol. 26, no. 1-2, ISSN 0190-5295, pages Abstract No. - 276.4 | International search | [A] - SINHA, S. ET AL., "Cellular mechanisms of beta-amyloid production and secretion", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (199909), vol. 96, pages 11049 - 11053, XP002951621 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.20.11049 | [Y] - VASSAR, R. ET AL., "beta-Secretase cleavage of Alzheimer's amyloid precursor protein by the transmembrane apartic protease BACE", SCIENCE, (19991022), vol. 286, pages 735 - 741, XP000914811 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.286.5440.735 | [Y] - HUBER, G. ET AL., "cDNA cloning and molecular characterization of human brain metalloprotease MP 100: a beta-secretase candidate", JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 72, pages 1215 - 1223, XP000911070 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1471-4159.1999.0721215.x | [Y] - SINHA, S. ET AL., "Purification and cloning of amyloid precursor protein beta-secretase from human brain", NATURE, (19991202), vol. 402, pages 537 - 540, XP000881765 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/990114 | [A] - DE STROOPER, B. ET AL., "Deficiency of presenilin-1 inhibits the normal cleavage of amyloid precursor protein", NATURE, (19980122), vol. 391, pages 387 - 390, XP001010557 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/34910 |