EP1430146 - NOVEL NUCLEIC ACIDS AND POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuvelo, Inc. 675 Almanor Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2004/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Y., Tom 4230 Ranwick Court San Jose, CA 95118 / CH | 02 /
ZHOU, Ping 7595 Newcastle Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
GOODRICH, Ryle 4896 Sandy Lane San Jose, CA 95124 / US | 04 /
ASUNDI, Vinod 709 Foster City Boulevard Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Jie 4930 Poplar Terrace Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 06 /
YANG, Yonghong 4230 Ranwick Court San Jose, CA 95118 / US | 07 /
WHERMAN, Tom CCSR Mol Pharm 3210, 269 West Campus Drive Stanford, California 94305 / US | 08 /
DRMANAC, Radoje, T. 850 East Greenwich Place Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/26] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Boeters & Lieck, Bereiteranger 15 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02719330.9 | 20.03.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002US08964 | Priority number, date | US20010815925 | 22.03.2001 Original published format: US 815925 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02077180 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1430146 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07K14/705 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
C12N9/6432 (EP,US);
C12Y304/21006 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/26] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE NUKLEINSÄUREN UND POLYPEPTIDE | [2004/26] | English: | NOVEL NUCLEIC ACIDS AND POLYPEPTIDES | [2004/26] | French: | NOUVEAUX ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ET NOUVEAUX POLYPEPTIDES | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 13.12.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - GENBANK, (20001122), Database accession no. (AF308602), XP002972045 | [X] - GENBANK, (19950113), Database accession no. (M73980), XP002972046 |