EP1386476 - TECHNIQUE FOR EFFECTIVELY COMMUNICATING TRAVEL DIRECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metro One Telecommunications, Inc. 11200 Murray Scholls Place Beaverton, OR 97007 / US | [2004/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELSEY, Nicholas, J. 3059 Oliver Street NW Washington D.C. 20015 / US | 02 /
REYES, Jonas, S. 8152 SW Hall Blvd. 309 Beaverton, OR 97008 / US | 03 /
SWICK, Corvin, F. P.O. Box 1846 White Salmon, WA 98672 / US | 04 /
HUEY, Christopher, A. 22365 N.W. Pihl Road Banks, OR 97106 / US | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schützenstrasse 15-17 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 02719334.1 | 22.03.2002 | [2004/06] | WO2002US09057 | Priority number, date | US20010826122 | 04.04.2001 Original published format: US 826122 | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02082236 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1386476 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42, H04M3/493, G01C21/26, G10L13/08 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
H04M3/493 (EP,US);
H04M11/08 (EP,US);
H04M2242/30 (EP,US);
H04M3/4933 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99931 (US)
|
Former IPC [2005/04] | H04M3/42, H04M3/493, G01C21/26 | ||
Former IPC [2004/06] | H04M3/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TECHNIK ZUR EFFEKTIVEN ÜBERMITTLUNG VON BEWEGUNGSRICHTUNGEN | [2004/06] | English: | TECHNIQUE FOR EFFECTIVELY COMMUNICATING TRAVEL DIRECTIONS | [2004/06] | French: | TECHNIQUE PERMETTANT DE COMMUNIQUER EFFICACEMENT DES DIRECTIONS DE DEPLACEMENT | [2004/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 18.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/24] | 01.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4812843 (CHAMPION III C PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * column 1, line 13 - column 6, line 41; figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP0465058 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 26-29* abstract *; | [X]US5634084 (MALSHEEN BATHSHEBA J [US], et al) [X] 26-29 * abstract *; | [X]US5845227 (PETERSON THOMAS D [US]) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - column 6, line 7; figures 3,4 *; | [X]WO0045373 (AMERITECH CORP [US], et al) [X] 26-29 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4024508 (BACHMAN CHARLES W, et al); | [Y]US4602129 (MATTHEWS GORDON H [US], et al); | [Y]US5737700 (COX PATRICK M [US], et al); | [Y]US5950123 (SCHWELB ERIC [CA], et al) |