EP1386065 - ELECTRICALLY REGENERATABLE FILTER ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. BEKAERT S.A. Bekaertstraat 2 8550 Zwevegem / BE | [2006/41] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states N.V. BEKAERT S.A. Bekaertstraat 2 8550 Zwevegem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARRECAU, Willy 37, Huntington Road Rome, GA 30165 / US | 02 /
WASTIJN, Koen Kapel te Rustestraat 38 B-8540 Deerlijk / BE | 03 /
DEVOOGHT, Geert Berantensstraat 12 B-8680 Koekelare / BE | [2004/06] | Application number, filing date | 02719760.7 | 31.01.2002 | [2004/06] | WO2002EP01158 | Priority number, date | US20010265907P | 05.02.2001 Original published format: US 265907 P | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02063146 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1386065 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1386065 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/027 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
B01D46/2403 (EP,US);
B01D46/52 (KR);
B01D46/521 (EP,US);
B01D46/785 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N13/017 (EP,US);
F01N13/14 (EP,US);
F01N3/0217 (EP,US);
F01N3/0226 (EP,US);
F01N3/027 (EP,US);
F01N3/031 (EP,US);
B01D2271/02 (EP,US);
B01D2275/10 (EP,US);
B01D2279/30 (EP,US);
F01N2260/10 (EP,US);
F01N2330/10 (EP,US);
F01N2330/14 (EP,US);
F01N2450/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH REGENERIERBARES FILTERELEMENT | [2004/06] | English: | ELECTRICALLY REGENERATABLE FILTER ELEMENT | [2004/06] | French: | ELEMENT FILTRANT REGENERABLE ELECTRIQUEMENT | [2004/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 02.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2006 | CY | 11.10.2006 | FI | 11.10.2006 | IT | 11.10.2006 | TR | 11.10.2006 | GR | 12.01.2007 | ES | 22.01.2007 | GB | 31.01.2007 | IE | 31.01.2007 | LU | 31.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
CY | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
LU | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 11.10.2006 | |
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | ES | 22.01.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4199387 (HLADIK STEPHEN M [US]) [A] 1,7* column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 37 *; | [A]US4687579 (BERGMAN WERNER [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 5 - column 8, line 16 *; | [X]US5395039 (KOEHLER PAUL C [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * column 2, line 50 - column 6, line 10 *; | [DA]US5709722 (NAGAI YOUICHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 5 - column 3, line 51 * * column 7, line 10 - column 7, line 35 *; | [X]WO0100971 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE], et al) [X] 1-6,8-13 * page 2, line 13 - page 10, line 15 *; | [E]WO02057000 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE], et al) [E] 1-4,6,7 * the whole document * |