EP1363752 - FORMING TOOL FOR HYDROMECHANICALLY DEEP-DRAWING WORKPIECES FROM SHEET METAL BLANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONHAUSER, Christian Malvenweg 26 85375 Neufahrn / DE | 02 /
RAUH, Wolfgang In der Schwärz 16 85092 Kösching / DE | 03 /
MANGLIERS, Mathias Henchelbergring 12 74906 Bad Rappenau / DE | 04 /
KAYA, Ali Herschelstrasse 2 85057 Ingolstadt / DE | 05 /
GOLLE, Matthias St.-Michael-Strasse 6 95701 Pechbrunn / DE | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Geissler, Manfred Audi AG Patentabteilung I/ES-8 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Geissler, Manfred Audi AG, Patentabteilung I/ES-8 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 02719899.3 | 22.02.2002 | [2003/48] | WO2002EP01894 | Priority number, date | DE2001110161 | 02.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10110161 | [2003/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02070163 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1363752 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1363752 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B21D22/20 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
B21D22/205 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49805 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/17] |
Former [2003/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | UMFORMWERKZEUG ZUM HYDROMECHANISCHEN TIEFZIEHEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN AUS BLECHZUSCHNITTEN | [2003/48] | English: | FORMING TOOL FOR HYDROMECHANICALLY DEEP-DRAWING WORKPIECES FROM SHEET METAL BLANKS | [2003/48] | French: | OUTIL DE FORMAGE DESTINE A L'EMBOUTISSAGE HYDROMECANIQUE PROFOND DE PIECES EN TANT QUE COUPES DE TOLES | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 17.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 13.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4314468 (BARIL JACQUES, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1552070 (SMG SUEDDEUTSCHE MASCHB GMBH) [A] 6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5271142 (MOORE III DAN T [US], et al); | [A]CH416520 (SIEMENS ELEKTROGERAETE GMBH [DE]) |