EP1485236 - WORKING ROBOT, ACTUATOR AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute of Science and Technology 39-1 Hawolgok-dong, Sungbook-ku Seoul 136-130 / KR | [2004/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Mun-Sang, Jinheung Apt. 8-502 65, Cheongdam-Dong, Gangnam-Gu Seoul 135-100 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Sung-Chul, Sibeom Comp. Hyeondae Apt 416-402 92, Seohyeon-Dong, Bundang-Gu Seongnam, Gyeonggi-Do 463-050 / KR | 03 /
CHO, Chang-Hyun, Jugong Apt. 431-601 Dunchon-Dong, Gangdong-Gu Seoul 134-060 / KR | 04 /
SHIN, Hyun-Oh 523, Yangjeong-Dong, Buk-Gu Ulsan 683-380 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Jea-Sun, Hyeondae1-cha Apt. 103-103 390-5, Ssangyong1-Dong Cheonan, Chungcheongnam-Do 330-091 / KR | 06 /
HWANG, Yo-Ha, Woosung Apt. 29-1003 Jamsil-Dong, Songpa-Gu Seoul 138-220 / KR | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Burbaud, Eric Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Burbaud, Eric Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02720655.6 | 18.04.2002 | [2004/51] | WO2002KR00710 | Priority number, date | KR20000008321 | 16.02.2002 Original published format: KR 2000008321 | [2004/51] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03072315 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1485236 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/10, B25J9/16, B25J17/02, B25J19/00 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
B25J17/0208 (EP,US);
B25J13/00 (KR);
B25J19/0091 (EP,US);
B25J9/1015 (EP,US);
B25J9/1633 (EP,US);
B25J9/1697 (EP,US);
F15B1/02 (KR);
G05B2219/39527 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39577 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/51] | B25J13/00 | Designated contracting states | FR [2004/51] | Title | German: | ARBEITSROBOTER, STELLGLIED UND STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2004/51] | English: | WORKING ROBOT, ACTUATOR AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2004/51] | French: | ROBOT DE SERVICE, ACTIONNEUR ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE ASSOCIE | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2003 | Translation filed | 15.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 15.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 22.11.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 16.09.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.11.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS6157401 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 7-9,12-14,19,20 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0187088U (UNKNOWN APPLICANT) [A] 1-20* figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5345675 (YAMANAKA YASUROU [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [XY] - CHANG-HYUN CHO ET AL, "Visual tracking manipulator with redundancy and its application to robotic wheel assembly", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2001 IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS. (IROS 2001). MAUI, HAWAII, OCT. 29 - NOV. 3, 2001; [IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20011029), vol. 3, doi:10.1109/IROS.2001.977173, ISBN 978-0-7803-6612-1, pages 1376 - 1381, XP010573766 [X] 1-4,6,10,11,15,17 * abstract * * page 1376, column r, paragraph l * * page 1377, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 1379, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph l * [Y] 5,7-9,12-14,16,18-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IROS.2001.977173 | [Y] - SON J S ET AL, "Preliminary results on grasping with vision and touch", INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS '96, IROS 96, PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1996 L EEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON OSAKA, JAPAN 4-8 NOV. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19961104), vol. 3, doi:10.1109/IROS.1996.568952, ISBN 978-0-7803-3213-3, pages 1068 - 1075, XP010212557 [Y] 5,16,18 * abstract * * page 1073, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IROS.1996.568952 | International search | [A]US5272423 (KIM DONG-IL [KR]); | [A]JPH06270060 (SHIN MEIWA IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH01274218 (FANUC LTD); | [A]JPH05143150 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [A]JPH02212086 (IBM JAPAN) |