EP1395218 - ABSORBENT PRODUCT WITH IMPROVED FIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [2004/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREVIK, Solgun Hulebäcksvägen 16 S-435 35 Mölnlycke / SE | 02 /
ASP, Fredrik Boklundsvägen 5 S-439 35 Onsala / SE | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Olsson, Stefan Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | Olsson, Stefan Albihns Göteborg AB, Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 02720712.5 | 08.04.2002 | [2004/11] | WO2002SE00685 | Priority number, date | SE20010001390 | 20.04.2001 Original published format: SE 0101390 | [2004/11] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02087483 | Date: | 07.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1395218 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1395218 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
A61F13/47218 (EP);
A61F13/475 (KR);
A61F13/4702 (EP);
A61F13/47245 (EP);
A61F13/47263 (EP);
A61F13/47272 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAUGFÄHIGES PRODUKT MIT VERBESSERTEM SITZ | [2004/11] | English: | ABSORBENT PRODUCT WITH IMPROVED FIT | [2004/11] | French: | PRODUIT ABSORBANT A AJUSTEMENT AMELIORE | [2004/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2002 | Translation filed | 14.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 24.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.02.2006 | BE | 15.02.2006 | CH | 15.02.2006 | CY | 15.02.2006 | FI | 15.02.2006 | LI | 15.02.2006 | LU | 08.04.2006 | IE | 10.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | DK | 15.05.2006 | GR | 16.05.2006 | PT | 17.07.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LU | 08.04.2006 | ||
IE | 10.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IE | 10.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IE | 10.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IE | 10.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IE | 10.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IE | 10.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 15.02.2006 | |
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2319186 (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE]); | [A]WO0126595 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) |