EP1360422 - ONE-WAY CLUTCH ASSEMBLY FEATURING IMPROVED STRUT STABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Means Industries, Inc. 3715 East Washington Road Saginaw, MI 48601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states MEANS INDUSTRIES, INC. 3715 East Washington Road Saginaw, MI 48601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAWLEY, Brice 6004 Woodpark Midland, MI 48640 / US | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 02720952.7 | 12.02.2002 | [2003/46] | WO2002US04133 | Priority number, date | US20010782071 | 12.02.2001 Original published format: US 782071 | [2003/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02064988 | Date: | 22.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1360422 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16D15/00, F16D41/12 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
F16D41/125 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/03] | F16D15/00 | ||
Former IPC [2003/46] | F16D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FREILAUFKUPPLUNGSANORDNUNG MIT VERBESSERTER STREBENSTABILITÄT | [2003/46] | English: | ONE-WAY CLUTCH ASSEMBLY FEATURING IMPROVED STRUT STABILITY | [2003/46] | French: | ENSEMBLE ROUE LIBRE CARACTERISE PAR UNE MEILLEURE STABILITE DES CLIQUETS | [2003/46] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 15.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.04.2008 | 16.04.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/01] | 22.08.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE375047 (AUTO DEBRAYAGE T L SA) [Y] 1-3,7,8,13-15,19* page 2, line 75 - line 90; figure - *; | [Y]US6032774 (GADD CRAIG T [US]) [Y] 1-3,7,8,13-15,19 * figure 3a * | International search | [A]US5829565 (FERGLE DONALD J [US], et al); | [A]US5927455 (BAKER EVAN R [US], et al); | [Y]US5954174 (COSTIN DANIEL P [US]); | [Y]US5964331 (REED MARTIN E [US], et al); | [A]US6065576 (SHAW DAVID W [US], et al) |