EP1381929 - TIERED PROCESSING METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING AND MITIGATING MERCHANT RISK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states First Data Corporation 401 Hackensack Avenue Hackensack, NJ 07601 / US | [2004/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'MARA, Timothy, L. 12 Continental Drive Centereach, NY 11720 / US | 02 /
MARQUES, Amy 153 N. Richmond Avenue Massapequa, NY 11758 / US | 03 /
LUNA-VICTORIA, Margot 28 Canterbury Road Woodbury, NY 11797 / US | 04 /
MARTELL, Patricia, A. 47 Shannon Boulevard Yaphank, NY 11980 / US | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 02721035.0 | 18.02.2002 | [2004/04] | WO2002US04787 | Priority number, date | US20010795050 | 26.02.2001 Original published format: US 795050 | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02069083 | Date: | 06.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1381929 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/03 (EP,US);
G06Q40/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGESTUFTES VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN UND VERMINDERN DES HÄNDLERRISIKOS | [2004/04] | English: | TIERED PROCESSING METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING AND MITIGATING MERCHANT RISK | [2004/04] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME A TROIS NIVEAUX PERMETTANT D'IDENTIFIER ET D'ATTENUER LE RISQUE COMMERCIAL | [2004/04] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 07.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/22] | 27.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/22] | 13.01.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   06.08.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4992940 (DWORKIN ROSS E [US]) [X] 1-22 * column 2 - column 9; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO9621192 (CITIBANK NA [US]) [X] 1-22* page 6 - page 16; figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO9834187 (AUTOCOM APS [DK], et al) [X] 1-22 * page 2 - page 7; figure 1 *; | [X]WO9910850 (CHASE MANHATTAN BANK NAT ASS [US]) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [X]US5883810 (FRANKLIN D CHASE [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * column 2 - column 7; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO9952026 (OPEN MARKET INC [US]) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0000905 (FIRST DATA CORP [US]) [X] 1-22 * page 3 - page 5; figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO0016219 (PEKAREK KOSTKA PETER [US]) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0048053 (ETIME CAPITAL INC [US]) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0077702 (FORD ROBERT M [US]) [X] 1-22 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5262941 (SALADIN EMERY F [US], et al); | [Y]US6064375 (VELEZ ARTHUR SILVIO [US], et al); | [A]US6141651 (RILEY JAMES F [US], et al); | [A]US6154729 (CANNON JONATHAN MICHAEL [US], et al); | [AP]US2001039532 (COLEMAN WILLIAM EDWARD [US], et al); | [YP]US2002007302 (WORK BRUCE V [US], et al) |