EP1395278 - OCULAR TEAR GROWTH FACTOR-LIKE PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA PATENT FOUNDATION 1224 West Main Street Suite 1-110 Charlottesville, VA 22903 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA PATENT FOUNDATION 1224 West Main Street, Suite 1-110 Charlottesville Virginia 22903 / US | ||
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA PATENT FOUNDATION 1224 West Main Street, Suite 1-110 Charlottesville, Virginia 22903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAURIE, Gordon, W. 919 St. Clair Avenue Charlottesville, VA 22901 / US | 02 /
SANGHI, Sandhya 2511 Kingsbury Drive Temple, TX 76502 / US | 03 /
KUMAR, Rajesh 2511 Kingsbury Drive Temple, TX 76502 / US | 04 /
LUMSDEN, Angela, J. 14 Stuart Street Mosman Park, W.A. 6012 / AU | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/11] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, Dr. rer. nat., et al Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf v. Stosch, Jehle Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02721062.4 | 20.02.2002 | [2004/11] | WO2002US04971 | Priority number, date | US20010269900P | 20.02.2001 Original published format: US 269900 P | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02065943 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1395278 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1395278 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61P27/02, C07K14/435, C07K14/47 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/475 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/11] | A61K38/08, A61K38/17, A61K38/18, C07K7/00, C07K14/00, C07K14/435, C07K14/475 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OKULARES TRÄNEN WACHSTUMSFAKTOR-ÄHNLICHES PROTEIN | [2004/11] | English: | OCULAR TEAR GROWTH FACTOR-LIKE PROTEIN | [2004/11] | French: | PROTEINE DE TYPE FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE DE LARMES OCULAIRES | [2004/11] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 03.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.07.2009 | BE | 15.07.2009 | CY | 15.07.2009 | DK | 15.07.2009 | FI | 15.07.2009 | NL | 15.07.2009 | SE | 15.07.2009 | GR | 16.10.2009 | PT | 15.11.2009 | LU | 20.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2012/37] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CY | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
SE | 15.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SANGHI SANDHYA ET AL, "cDNA cloning and expression of OlacritinO, a novel secreted glycoprotein of the lacrimal gland", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (199911), Database accession no. PREV200000031982, XP002329462 [X] 3-6 * abstract * | [X] - SANGHI S ET AL, "Cloning, protein expression and chromosomal mapping of human lacritin (HL-2): A novel lacrimal gland secretory glycoprotein", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20000315), Database accession no. PREV200000237325, XP002329463 [X] 3-6 * abstract * | [X] - KUMAR, R. ET AL., "Homo sapiens extracellular glycoprotein lacritin precursor gene, complet cds", EMBL, (20010102), Database accession no. AY005150, URL: EMBL, XP002329464 [X] 3-6 * column A * | [XP] - SANGHI S ET AL, "cDNA and genomic cloning of lacritin, a novel secretion enhancing factor from the human lacrimal gland", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20010629), vol. 310, no. 1, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 127 - 139, XP004464186 [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.2001.4748 | [A] - EMBL, (19981006), URL: EMBL, XP002329465 [A] * column A * | [A] - HSPAF93, EMBL, (19990125), XP002329466 [A] * column A * | [XP] - LAURIE G W ET AL, "LACRITIN HOMOLOGY ECM BINDING AND GENE STRUCTURE", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE, ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH IN VISION AND, US, (20010315), vol. 42, no. 4, ISSN 0146-0404, page S260, XP009048224 [XP] 1-14 * abstract * | [ ] - MOLECULAR BIOLOGY OF THE CELL, 39TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR CELL BIOLOGY; WASHINGTON, D.C., USA; DECEMBER 11-15, 1999, (199911), vol. 10, no. SUPPL., ISSN 1059-1524, page 68a, XP009048223 | [ ] - IOVS, ANNUAL MEETING OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH IN VISION AND OPHTHALMOLOGY.; FORT LAUDERDALE, FLORIDA, USA; APRIL 30-MAY 05, 2000, (20000315), vol. 41, no. 4, page S63, XP009048225 | International search | [X]WO9827205 (GENETICS INST [US]); | [XP]US2002102604 (MILNE EDWARDS JEAN-BAPTISTE DU [FR], et al); | [XP]US2002164669 (RUBEN STEVEN M [US], et al) |