EP1373912 - COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM WITH FRAUD MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Worldcom, Inc. 500 Clinton Center Drive Clinton, MS 39056 / US | [2004/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASLIN, Michael, F. 989 Pulpit Rock Ct. Colorado Springs, CO 80918 / US | 02 /
VAN ARKEL, John, Hans 4125 Brigadoon Lane Colorado Springs, CO 80909 / US | 03 /
SPRINGER, Arthur, Lance 129 Gilbertville Road Waterloo, IA 50707 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Harald Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Hofmann, Harald Sonnenberg Fortmann, Patent- & Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02721467.5 | 20.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002US08321 | Priority number, date | US20010276923P | 20.03.2001 Original published format: US 276923 P | US20010276953P | 20.03.2001 Original published format: US 276953 P | US20010276954P | 20.03.2001 Original published format: US 276954 P | US20010276955P | 20.03.2001 Original published format: US 276955 P | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02075339 | Date: | 26.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1373912 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04M7/00, H04M3/22, H04Q3/00, H04L29/06, H04L12/14 | [2005/07] | CPC: |
H04M15/06 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
H04L12/14 (EP,US);
H04L12/1403 (EP,US);
H04L12/1446 (EP,US);
H04L41/00 (US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04L47/125 (EP,US);
H04L47/19 (EP,US);
H04L47/2408 (EP,US);
H04L47/2433 (EP,US);
H04L47/2441 (EP,US);
H04L61/00 (EP,US);
H04L61/4523 (EP,US);
H04L61/4535 (EP,US);
H04L61/4557 (EP,US);
H04L63/0272 (EP,US);
H04L63/102 (EP,US);
H04L63/1408 (EP,US);
H04L63/1416 (EP,US);
H04L63/1458 (EP,US);
H04L65/103 (EP,US);
H04L65/104 (EP,US);
H04L65/1043 (EP,US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04L65/1094 (EP);
H04L65/1096 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,US);
H04L65/401 (EP,US);
H04L65/612 (EP,US);
H04L65/762 (EP,US);
H04L67/06 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04L67/303 (EP,US);
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
H04L67/34 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04L67/563 (EP,US);
H04L67/61 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/41 (EP,US);
H04M15/43 (EP,US);
H04M15/44 (EP,US);
H04M15/47 (EP,US);
H04M15/49 (EP,US);
H04M15/51 (EP,US);
H04M15/52 (EP,US);
H04M15/53 (EP,US);
H04M15/55 (EP,US);
H04M15/56 (EP,US);
H04M15/58 (EP,US);
H04M15/63 (EP,US);
H04M15/745 (EP,US);
H04M15/80 (EP,US);
H04M15/8207 (EP,US);
H04M15/8214 (EP,US);
H04M15/8292 (EP,US);
H04M3/2218 (EP,US);
H04M3/42229 (EP,US);
H04M3/46 (EP,US);
H04M3/465 (EP,US);
H04M7/0075 (EP,US);
H04M7/0078 (EP,US);
H04M7/1205 (EP,US);
H04M7/128 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0029 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04L43/00 (EP,US);
H04L43/06 (EP,US);
H04L43/0817 (EP,US);
H04L43/16 (EP,US);
H04L69/08 (US);
H04M2207/203 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0104 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0108 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0148 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0152 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0164 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0168 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0172 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0176 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0188 (EP,US);
H04M2215/2013 (EP,US);
H04M2215/202 (EP,US);
H04M2215/2046 (EP,US);
H04M2215/22 (EP,US);
H04M2215/44 (EP,US);
H04M2215/46 (EP,US);
H04M2215/54 (EP,US);
H04M2215/7813 (EP,US);
H04M2215/782 (EP,US);
H04M7/006 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
H04W4/20 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | G01R31/08, H04M17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT BETRUGSÜBERWACHUNG | [2004/01] | English: | COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM WITH FRAUD MONITORING | [2004/01] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION AVEC SURVEILLANCE DE FRAUDE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 20.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/38] | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6134307 (BROUCKMAN RANDALL W [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 8 *; | [PX]EP1124370 (AT & T WIRELESS SERVICES INC [US]) [PX] 1-8* paragraphs [0017] - [0023] * | International search | [Y]US5606604 (ROSENBLATT ROBERTA S [US], et al); | [Y]US5995604 (CHAN KEN YAT-WAN [CA], et al) |