EP1374081 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING PERSONALIZED CUSTOMER SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company M/S 1051, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304-1112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANSFIELD, Michael, A. 11808 W. Dason Court Boise, ID 83713 / US | 02 /
FRIDRICH, Donald, J. 3016 Navajo Drive Nampa, ID 83686 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02721492.3 | 19.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002US08527 | Priority number, date | US20010819427 | 27.03.2001 Original published format: US 819427 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02077762 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1374081 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES PERSONALISIERTEN KUNDENDIENSTES | [2004/01] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING PERSONALIZED CUSTOMER SUPPORT | [2004/01] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE SERVICE CLIENT PERSONNALISE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 12.07.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [XP]US6240420 (LEE KANG-DONG [KR]); | [A]US2001018673 (GOLDBAND STEVE [US], et al); | [YP]US6230287 (PINARD DEBBIE [CA], et al) |