EP1374343 - METHOD OF MAKING STITCHED LGA CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOPATA, John, E. 325 Hemlock Lane Naperville, IL 60540 / US | 02 /
McGRATH, James, L. 258 Wren Drive Bloomingdale, IL 60108 / US | 03 /
DUTTA, Arindum 5805 Oakwood Drive D Lisle, IL 60532 / US | 04 /
MENZIN, Marvin 26 Mason Street Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 05 /
FISHER, Daniel, Jr. 9 Village View Road Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2005/28] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff CF24 0AA / GB | ||
Former [2004/01] | Evans, Huw David Duncan Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff CF24 OAA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02721506.0 | 20.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002US08647 | Priority number, date | US20010815115 | 22.03.2001 Original published format: US 815115 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02078130 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1374343 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1374343 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/24 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
H05K7/1061 (EP,US);
H01R13/24 (KR);
H01R13/33 (EP,US);
H01R13/2414 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49133 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49135 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49139 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49146 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49174 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49179 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49194 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4922 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/41] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GENÄHTEN LGA STECKVERBINDERS | [2004/01] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING STITCHED LGA CONNECTOR | [2004/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CONNECTEUR DE BOITIER LGA COUSU | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 14.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 06.10.2004 | [2006/32] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0574793 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-25 * column 5, line 1 - column 9, line 8; figure 1 *; | [A]US5973394 (SLOCUM ALEXANDER H [US], et al) [A] 1-25* column 5, line 14 - column 7, line 15; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1049205 (BERG ELECTRONICS MFG [NL]) [A] 1-25 * column 3, line 30 - column 6, line 29; figure 1 * |