EP1361889 - NOVEL VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals s.a. rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A. Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARCON, Nathalie GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals Rue de l'Institut 89 B-1330 Rixensart / BE | 02 /
SLAOUI, Moncef, Mohamed GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals Rue de l'Institut 89 B-1330 Rixensart / BE | 03 /
VAN HOECKE, Christian GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals Rue de l'Institut 89 B-1330 Rixensart / BE | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Miller, David James, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Miller, David James, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2006/33] | Crepin, Carine Marie Blanche, et al Corporate Intellectual Property GlaxoSmithKline CN925.1 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2003/47] | Stephen, Robert John GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02722113.4 | 21.02.2002 | [2003/47] | WO2002EP01843 | Priority number, date | GB20010004542 | 23.02.2001 Original published format: GB 0104542 | GB20010008366 | 03.04.2001 Original published format: GB 0108366 | [2003/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02067983 | Date: | 06.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1361889 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/145, C12N7/04 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/145 (US);
A61K9/0021 (US);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61K2039/54 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16134 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16163 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE VAKZINE | [2003/47] | English: | NOVEL VACCINE | [2003/47] | French: | NOUVEAU VACCIN | [2003/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 29.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 20.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/10] | 03.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9419013 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-11,16,17 * page 27; examples 25,26,30; claim 5 * [Y] 13-15,18,19; | [Y]WO9815287 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG [BE], et al) [Y] 15* page 4; claim 8 *; | [Y] - VASIL'EVA R I ET AL, "STUDY OF THE RESULTS OF USING NEW INACTIVATED WHOLE-VIRION INFLUENZA VACCINES IN THE USSR", ZHURNAL MIKROBIOLOGII EPIDEMIOLOGII I IMMUNOBIOLOGII, (1987), no. 3, ISSN 0372-9311, pages 38 - 42, XP008005763 [Y] 1,13,14,16,18,19 * page 42, column 2, paragraph 3; tables 1,2 * | [YD] - HALPERIN W ET AL, "A COMPARISON OF THE INTRADERMAL AND SUBCUTANEOUS ROUTES OF INFLUENZA VACCINATION WITH A/NEW JERSEY/76 (SWINE FLU) AND A/VICTORIA/75: REPORT OF A STUDY AND REVIEW OF THE LITERATURE", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PUBLIC HEALTH, AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (197912), vol. 12, no. 69, ISSN 0090-0036, pages 1247 - 1256, XP008003236 [YD] 1,16 * page 1251 * | Examination | WO9934850 | WO02087494 | - NICULESCU T.H. ET AL, "Efficacy of an adsorbed trivalent split influenza vaccine administered by intradermal route", ARCH. ROUM. PATH. EXP. MICROBIOL., (1981), vol. 40, no. 1, pages 67 - 70, XP008062359 | - LAURENT P. ET AL, "Evaluation of the clinical performance of a new intradermal vaccine administration technique and associated delivery system", VACCINE, (2007), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2007.10.020, pages 8833 - 8842, XP022374866 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2007.10.020 | - BROWN H ET AL, "The immunizing effect of influenza A/New Jersey/76 (Hsw1N1) virus vaccine administered intradermally and intramuscularly to adults.", THE JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES DEC 1977, (197712), vol. 136 Suppl, ISSN 0022-1899, pages S466 - S471, XP008003234 | - HERBERT F A ET AL, "Comparison of responses to influenza A/New Jersey/76-A/Victoria/75 virus vaccine administered intradermally or subcutaneously to adults with chronic respiratory disease.", THE JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES AUG 1979, (197908), vol. 140, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1899, pages 234 - 238, XP008003233 | - Influenza virus vaccine USP trivalent types A and B (zonal purified, subvirion) Fluzone product information. |